Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark A Goldsmith
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-13193
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 4:29 AM EST
Defendant
Jeffrey Garrison
Represented By
Kali M. L. Henderson
Seward Peck & Henderson PLLC
contact info
Daniel Zick
Kerr, Russell, And Weber PLC
contact info
T. Joseph Seward
Seward Henderson PLLC
contact info
James E. Tamm
Kerr, Russell, And Weber, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Erica Parker
Represented By
Kali M. L. Henderson
Seward Peck & Henderson PLLC
contact info
T. Joseph Seward
Seward Henderson PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Raymond Prater
Represented By
Kali M. L. Henderson
Seward Peck & Henderson PLLC
contact info
Daniel Zick
Kerr, Russell, And Weber PLC
contact info
T. Joseph Seward
Seward Henderson PLLC
contact info
James E. Tamm
Kerr, Russell, And Weber, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Rolland Sizemore
Represented By
Kali M. L. Henderson
Seward Peck & Henderson PLLC
contact info
T. Joseph Seward
Seward Henderson PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Sloat
Represented By
Kali M. L. Henderson
Seward Peck & Henderson PLLC
contact info
Daniel Zick
Kerr, Russell, And Weber PLC
contact info
T. Joseph Seward
Seward Henderson PLLC
contact info
James E. Tamm
Kerr, Russell, And Weber, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Greene Mazur
23875 Michigan Avenue #486
Dearborn, MI 48124

GPO Mar 03 2025
ORDER Terminating as Moot Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 19, 20). Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SKra)

Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
42 42 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/01 5:45 PM
REPLY to Response re36 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeffrey Garrison, Pinckney, Village of, Raymond Prater, Ashley Sloat. (Zick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/01 10:30 AM
REPLY to Response re37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Livingston, County of, Erica Parker, Rolland Sizemore. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
40 40 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/17 12:40 PM
RESPONSE to36 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss Parties/Pinckney et.al. filed by Mary Greene Mazur [E-filer]. (Mazur [E-filer], Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Tribal Credentials,
Att: 2 Exhibit Automobile Title,
Att: 3 Exhibit FBI exchange with Tribe,
Att: 4 Exhibit Comparison of different Tribes,
Att: 5 Exhibit Transcript of PC Hearing,
Att: 6 Exhibit 87 FedReg 4638
39 39 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/17 10:14 AM
RESPONSE to37 MOTION to Dismiss Parties/Livingston CTY et.al. filed by Mary Greene Mazur [E-filer]. (Mazur [E-filer], Mary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
38 38 order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Tue 03/18 4:09 PM
ORDER Requiring Response to37 Motion to Dismiss,36 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 4/17/2025 Reply due by 5/1/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SKra)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
37 37 motion Dismiss Mon 03/17 5:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Livingston, County of, Erica Parker, Rolland Sizemore. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Dismiss Mon 03/17 3:53 PM
Renewed MOTION to Dismiss by Jeffrey Garrison, Pinckney, Village of, Raymond Prater. (Zick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 03/11 11:45 AM
ORDER terminating as moot Motion for Service (ECF No.28 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SKra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
34 34 misc Attorney Appearance Wed 03/05 2:58 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James E. Tamm appearing on behalf of Pinckney, Village of (Tamm, James)
Related: [-]
33 33 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Wed 03/05 12:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Pinckney, Village of waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Zick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Appearance Wed 03/05 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Zick on behalf of Pinckney, Village of. (Zick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Wed 03/05 9:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Livingston, County of waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Appearance Wed 03/05 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kali M. L. Henderson on behalf of Livingston, County of. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Appearance Wed 03/05 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by T. Joseph Seward on behalf of Livingston, County of. (Seward, T.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
28 28 motion For Order Mon 03/03 6:59 PM
MOTION for Order by Mary Greene Mazur [E-filer]. (Mazur [E-filer], Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
27 27 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Mon 03/03 6:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mary Greene Mazur [E-filer] against All Parties. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Mazur [E-filer], Mary)
Related: [-]
26 26 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Mon 03/03 6:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mary Greene Mazur [E-filer] against All Parties. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Mazur [E-filer], Mary)
Related: [-]
25 25 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/03 10:25 AM
ORDER Terminating as Moot Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos.19 ,20 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SKra)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Issued* Mon 03/03 8:32 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Livingston, County of, Pinckney, Village of* (SSch)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
23 23 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Sun 03/02 6:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mary Greene Mazur [E-filer] against All Parties. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Mazur [E-filer], Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation Summons,
Att: 2 Document Continuation Summons
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
22 22 order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Wed 02/12 1:33 PM
ORDER Requiring Response to19 Motion to Dismiss and20 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 3/14/2025 Reply due by 3/28/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SKra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
21 21 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Tue 02/11 9:14 AM
ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr and Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr re19 Motion to Dismiss,20 Motion to Dismiss - Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (CCie)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
20 20 motion Dismiss Mon 02/10 4:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Rolland Sizemore, Erica Parker. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Mon 02/10 3:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Jeffrey Garrison, Raymond Prater, Ashley Sloat. (Zick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
misc Pro Se E-filing Access Given Tue 02/04 8:18 AM
Pro Se E-filing Access Given to Mary Greene Mazur [E-filer]. (TTho)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
18 18 notice Appearance Wed 12/18 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Zick on behalf of Jeffrey Garrison, Raymond Prater, Ashley Sloat. (Zick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Attorney Appearance Wed 12/18 10:37 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James E. Tamm appearing on behalf of Jeffrey Garrison, Raymond Prater, Ashley Sloat (Tamm, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
16 16 order Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 12/16 3:24 PM
ORDER of Attorney Substitution with stipulation. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JPar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
12 12 service Certificate of Service Tue 12/10 10:22 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re11 Waiver of Service Executed (60 Day),10 Waiver of Service Executed (60 Day),7 Waiver of Service Executed (60 Day),6 Notice of Appearance,9 Waiver of Service Executed (60 Day),8 Waiver of Service Executed (60 Day),5 Notice of Appearance by All Defendants (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 12/10 10:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Ashley Sloat waiver sent on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 12/10 10:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Rolland Sizemore waiver sent on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 12/10 10:20 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Raymond Prater waiver sent on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 12/10 10:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Erica Parker waiver sent on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 12/10 10:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Jeffrey Garrison waiver sent on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Tue 12/10 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kali M. L. Henderson on behalf of All Defendants. (Henderson, Kali)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Tue 12/10 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by T. Joseph Seward on behalf of All Defendants. (Seward, T.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
15 15 misc Errata Sheet Tue 12/10 3:43 PM
ERRATA Sheet re:1 Complaint filed by Mary Greene Mazur. (TTho)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued* Tue 12/10 3:42 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Jeffrey Garrison, Raymond Prater, Ashley Sloat* (TTho)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/10 2:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned re: Erica Parker, Ashley Sloat, Raymond Prater, Rolland Sizemore, Jeffrey Garrison filed by Nathaniel Verellen (process server)[DATE OF DELIVERY ON GREEN CARDS ARE BLANK] (TTho)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/04 2:37 PM
ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOLS ON FILINGS AND COMMUNICATION WITH THE COURT - Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (CCie)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Wed 12/04 9:08 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (ABun)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 12/04 2:38 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re4 Order on Mary Greene Mazur at 23875 Michigan Avenue #486 Dearborn, MI 48124-9998 (CCie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 12/03 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Mary Greene Mazur against Jeffrey Garrison, Erica Parker, Raymond Prater, Rolland Sizemore, Ashley Sloat Receipt No: 150013112 - Fee: $ 405. (JHea)
Related: [-]