Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:24-cv-02768
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Terminated:Jan 13, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/18 7:17 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 7 Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. On January 13, 2025, the Court dismissed 4 this action without prejudice because Petitioner failed to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or move to proceed in forma pauperis. Two months later, Petitioner filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The motion is incomplete because Petitioner failed to include "a certificate from the warden or other appropriate officer of the place of confinement showing the amount of money or securities that [he] has in any account in the institution." Rule 3(a)(2), Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. The form application instructed Petitioner to submit this certificate and warned that his failure to do so could result in the denial of his request to proceed in forma pauperis. (Doc. 7 at 5). Accordingly, the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. This case remains closed. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/18/2025. (MWC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/17 12:48 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nelson C. Navarro.(JK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Supplement,
Att: 3 Mailing Envelope
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/27 1:03 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Nelson C. Navarro (JK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 01/13 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JTM)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 01/13 8:40 AM
ORDER: This action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with 2 the December 4, 2024, order and failure to prosecute. The Clerk must CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/13/2025. (MWC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
3 3 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 12/20 12:03 PM
Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Nelson C. Navarro.(ARL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
2 2 3 pgs order Order Wed 12/04 10:00 AM
ORDER: The petition for writ of habeas corpus 1 is STRICKEN. Within THIRTY DAYS of the date of this order, Mr. Navarro must sign and file an amended petition on the standard form. Also, within THIRTY DAYS of the date of this order, Mr. Navarro must either (1) file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or (2) pay the $5.00 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to update Mr. Navarro's address to reflect his incarceration at Hardee Correctional Institution, 6901 State Road 62, Bowling Green, Florida 33834-9505. The Clerk is further directed to send Mr. Navarro a copy of the petition 1 as well as an Affidavit of Indigency form and the standard form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/4/2024. (MWC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 12/03 3:40 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Nelson C. Navarro. No IFP motion filed. Fees not paid. (JKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope