Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gail A Weilheimer
Case #: 2:24-cv-06459
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 4:56 AM EST
Defendant
IndustryMasters, Inc.
131 Continental Drive, Ste. 305
Newark, DE 19713
Represented By
GREGORY T. STURGES
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM MARTIN
2510 Alden Road, No. 0822
Bryn Athyn, PA 19009
Represented By
WILLIAM J FOX
Law Offices Of William J. Fox, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 03/13 8:01 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/23/2025 10:15 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER.(rt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/13 3:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by IndustryMasters, Inc..(STURGES, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Fri 01/31 3:29 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DATE BY WHICH DEFENDANT MUST ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IS 2/13/25. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 1/30/25. 1/31/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 01/30 3:15 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney) to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by IndustryMasters, Inc.. (STURGES, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 01/16 2:51 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III TO DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 01/16/2025. 01/16/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
7 7 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 12/30 10:29 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DATE BY WHICH DEFENDANT MUST ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IS JANUARY 30, 2025.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/30/2024. 12/30/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 12/27 12:41 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time Time to Respond to Complaint by IndustryMasters, Inc.. (STURGES, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/27 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY T. STURGES on behalf of IndustryMasters, Inc. with Certificate of Service(STURGES, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
4 4 misc Praecipe/Request Wed 12/04 12:49 PM
To Attach Exhibit "A" to Complaint by WILLIAM MARTIN. (FOX, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint) Wed 12/04 12:47 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by WILLIAM MARTIN. Amendment to1 Complaint (Attorney) Corrected Designation Form . (FOX, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 12/04 12:34 PM
Summons Issued as to IndustryMasters, Inc.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 12/4/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Wed 12/04 9:55 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Obsolete Form, Newest version is available on our website. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 12/03 6:37 PM
COMPLAINT against WILLIAM MARTIN ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17919426.), filed by WILLIAM MARTIN.(FOX, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]