Maryland District Court
Case #: 8:24-mj-02720
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 04, 2024 2:24 AM EST
Defendant
Sarah Katherine Magid (1)
Represented By
Nicholas George Madiou
Brennan, Mckenna & Lawlor, Chartered
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Megan Samantha McKoy
Doj-Usao
contact info
Elizabeth G Wright
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/20/2025 1:28 AM EST
Monday, November 04, 2024
1 1 1 pgs SEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Sarah Katherine Magid (1). (cm4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 Government's Motion to Seal and Order GRANTING same as to Sarah Katherine Magid Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/4/2024. (cm4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]