Mississippi Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00101
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 05, 2024 1:33 AM CST
Defendant
Adrian Durr (1)
Represented By
Michael Verdier Cory, Jr.
Danks, Miller & Cory
contact info
Interested Party
Probation Jackson
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Samuel Philip Goff-Federal Gov
U. S. Attorney'S Office - Jackson
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/05/2024 3:14 AM CST
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by Samuel Philip Goff - Federal Gov. as to Adrian Durr. (ND)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Case as to Adrian Durr (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 10/8/2024 (ND)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Adrian Durr (1) count(s) 1. (ND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Maximum Penalty,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet
5 5 Praecipe for Warrant by USA as to Adrian Durr. (ND)
Related: [-]