Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-43528

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jil Mazer-Marino
Case #: 1:24-ap-01104
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mehmet Ferit Has
2718 Ocean Avenue, Apt. E7
Brooklyn, NY 11229
Represented By
Mehmet Ferit Has
contact info
Plaintiff
First National Bank of Omaha
P. O. Box 2490
Omaha, NE 68103
Represented By
Gregg Tabakin
Fein, Such, Kahn & Shepard P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Wed 03/26 1:37 PM
Marked Off Without Hearing Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint by First National Bank of Omaha against Mehmet Ferit Has - Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) - Judgment entered on 2/21/25 - See Document No 5 (tml
Sunday, February 23, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Mon 02/24 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 02/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
5 5 order Judgment (Signed by Judge) (1/1/11) Fri 02/21 11:25 AM
Order and Judgment of Nondischargeability. The Court has considered the pleadings and the Stipulation for Judgment executed by the parties. Final judgment is hereby entered ordering the sum of $3,378.00 to be nondischargeable pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 523(a)(2) as against Debtor, Mehmet Ferit Has, and in favor of First National Bank of Omaha. The terms of the Stipulation for Judgment executed by the parties are incorporated herein by reference. Related [+]. Signed on 2/21/2025 (dnb)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Proposed Stipulation
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Tue 02/18 4:24 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Settlement Filed by First National Bank of Omaha. (Tabakin, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 02/12 12:41 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Gregg Tabakin Representing Plaintiff - Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/20/2025 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint by First National Bank of Omaha against Mehmet Ferit Has - Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) (tml
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Mon 12/09 12:36 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against Mehmet Ferit Has Answer Due: 1/8/2025. Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/11/2025 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Tue 12/03 5:46 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet Filed by Gregg Tabakin on behalf of First National Bank of Omaha (Tabakin, Gregg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/03 5:44 PM
Adversary case 1 24-01104 Complaint by First National Bank of Omaha against Mehmet Ferit Has. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)). (Tabakin, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A