Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:24-cv-02792
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 5:38 AM EST
Defendant
Melba Allen
Defendant
Charles Barrow
Defendant
Melissa Brashears
Defendant
State of Florida
Represented By
Katherine Rosen
Florida Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Harold Lynn Winslow
1217 Magellan Drive
Sarasota, FL 34243


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
28 28 service Summons issued Thu 04/24 11:02 AM
SUMMONS re-issued as to Melba Allen, Charles Barrow, Melissa Brashears. (JKB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
27 27 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Hearing / Conference Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment Wed 04/16 10:44 AM
ORDER construing Winslow's 17 objection and 22 25 motions for relief as a response to the State of Florida's motion to dismiss; granting the State of Florida's 13 motion to dismiss; denying as moot Winslow's 24 motion for a hearing and 26 motion for an expedited ruling and injunctive relief. No later than 14 DAYS from the date of this Order, Winslow must serve the amended complaint on Officer Allen, Officer Barrow, and Officer Brashears and file proof of service. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/16/2025. (JT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
26 26 motion Expedite Preliminary Injunction Declaratory Judgment Tue 04/15 11:41 AM
MOTION to Expedited Injunction and MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Harold Lynn Winslow. (e-portal) Chambers notified. (JKB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
25 25 respm Response to motion Fri 03/21 9:24 AM
RESPONSE in support of22 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Defendants State of Florida's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Harold Lynn Winslow. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
24 24 motion Hearing / Conference Tue 03/04 10:39 AM
MOTION to Schedule Hearing by Harold Lynn Winslow. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Inquiry Thu 02/20 4:51 PM
NOTICE of inquiry by Harold Lynn Winslow. Clerk responded with courtesy copy of docket sheet. (LSS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/18 10:27 AM
MOTION for Relief to Defendant State of Florida's Motion to Dismiss13 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Harold Lynn Winslow. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 02/06 9:31 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Harold Lynn Winslow. Related case(s): No. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/06 9:25 AM
NOTICE, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Harold Lynn Winslow. (JKB)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 02/06 9:09 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Harold Lynn Winslow. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Case Management Report Thu 02/06 9:06 AM
UNILATERAL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
17 17 respoth Objection Wed 02/05 8:53 AM
OBJECTION re13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Harold Lynn Winslow. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Thu 01/23 8:02 AM
ORDER denying Winslow's 7 10 motions for default judgment. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/23/2025. (JT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
16 16 misc Affidavit Thu 01/23 9:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Diligent Search and Inquiry for Charles Barrow affirmed by Angelica M. Barros by Harold Lynn Winslow. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Affidavit Thu 01/23 9:27 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Diligent Search and Inquiry for Melba Allen affirmed by Angelica M. Barros by Harold Lynn Winslow. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Mon 01/06 3:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by State of Florida. (Rosen, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 01/03 12:30 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by State of Florida. Related case(s): Yes (Rosen, Katherine)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Fri 01/03 12:28 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by State of Florida. (Rosen, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
10 10 motion Default - Clerks Entry of Default Thu 01/02 3:08 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against Melissa Brashears by Harold Lynn Winslow. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons
9 9 service Summons returned unexecuted Thu 01/02 2:30 PM
SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Harold Lynn Winslow as to Melba Allen. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons returned unexecuted Thu 01/02 2:27 PM
SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Harold Lynn Winslow as to Charles Barrow. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Default - Clerks Entry of Default Thu 01/02 2:23 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against State of Florida by Harold Lynn Winslow. (Signed) (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit: Summons
Monday, December 23, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/26 9:20 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Melba Allen, Charles Barrow, Melissa Brashears, State of Florida filed by Harold Lynn Winslow. (signed) Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Harold Lynn Winslow. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Friday, December 20, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of appearance Fri 12/20 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Rosen on behalf of State of Florida (Rosen, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
4 4 service Summons returned executed Fri 12/13 3:37 PM
RETURN of service executed on 12/5/24 by Harold Lynn Winslow as to State of Florida to Rosanny Nunez as Authorized Representative. (JKB) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/13/2024) Mailing Envelope
3 3 service Summons returned executed Fri 12/13 3:33 PM
RETURN of service executed on 12/9/24 by Harold Lynn Winslow as to Melissa Brashears. (JKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
2 2 service Summons issued Wed 12/04 11:14 AM
SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (LD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/04 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee $405.00, receipt number TPA71415 filed by Harold Lynn Winslow.(LD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet