Syed v. Relig Staffing, Inc.
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Robert E Blackburn |
Referred: | N Reid Neureiter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03362 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:0206 - FLSA -- Minimum Wage |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2024 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 2:43 AM MST |
Defendant
Relig Staffing, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Sadul Mateen Syed
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Costs Taxed by Clerk in the amount of $545.00 against Defendant Relig Staffing, Inc. and in favor of Plaintiff Syed. (zcoth) |
|
Wednesday, March 05, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NON-STIPULATED Proposed Bill of Costs by Plaintiff Sadul Mateen Syed. Parties conferred on 2/26/2025. The following category or categories remain under dispute: Fees of the Clerk. Fees for service of summons and complaint. Docket fees under 28 U.S.C. Section 1923. Per court procedure, any objection to the Proposed Bill of Costs is due within 14 days(Sanchez, Cynthia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Sadul Mateen Syed against Relig Staffing, Inc. pursuant to the11 Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment. Entered by Clerk on 2/19/2025. (hguer) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ORDER granting the9 Motion for Default Judgment. Entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/19/2025. (hguer) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 01/27 3:11 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Relig Staffing, Inc. re8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Relig Staffing, Inc. , by Clerk. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Relig Staffing, Inc. by Plaintiff Sadul Mateen Syed.(Harrison, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Relig Staffing, Inc. by Plaintiff Sadul Mateen Syed.(Harrison, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, December 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sadul Mateen Syed. Relig Staffing, Inc. served on 12/5/2024, answer due 12/26/2024. (Sanchez, Cynthia) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE The above-captioned case has been referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter pursuant to the Order Referring Case, entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on December 5, 2024 (Dkt. # 5 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall promptly serve Defendant. A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: March 4, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937# . If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/5/2024. (norlin, ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 12/05 8:03 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a)and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a SchedulingOrder that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders asappropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, furtherthat the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of JudgeBlackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred,subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referredas defined in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. Onthe recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the partiesby motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, asettlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/5/2024. Text Only Entry |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Adam M. Harrison by Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison on behalf of Sadul Mateen SyedAttorney Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison added to party Sadul Mateen Syed(pty:pla) (Harrison, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 12/04 11:30 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Relig Staffing, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10016538)Attorney Cynthia Jeannet Sanchez added to party Sadul Mateen Syed(pty:pla), filed by Sadul Mateen Syed.(Sanchez, Cynthia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |