South Carolina District Court
Judge:Timothy M Cain
Case #: 7:24-cv-07021
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 6:13 AM EST
Defendant
NVR, Inc
Represented By
Paul Nicholas Nybo, I
Parker Poe Adams And Bernstein (cha)
contact info
Taylor Harrison Stair
Parker Poe Adams And Bernstein (cha)
contact info
Plaintiff
Brett Freeborough
Represented By
John-Paul Baum
Campbell Teague
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Freeborough
Represented By
John-Paul Baum
Campbell Teague
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
13 13 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/17 2:13 PM
TEXT ORDER extending the stay per 12 Joint Status Report. The parties are directed to file a joint status report in sixty (60) days or earlier if the issue is resolved. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Chief Judge Timothy M Cain on 3/17/25. (kmca)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Status Report Mon 03/17 10:56 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Joint Request to Extend Stay by NVR, Inc, Heather Freeborough, Brett Freeborough. (Stair, Taylor) Modified on 3/17/2025: to add joint filers as listed, to edit text (kmca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Nicholas Nybo, I on behalf of NVR, Inc (Nybo, Paul)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 01/16 11:12 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 8 Joint Motion to Stay. The parties are directed to file a joint status report in sixty (60) days or earlier if the issue is resolved. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Chief Judge Timothy M Cain on 1/16/25.(kmca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
8 8 motion Stay Wed 01/15 5:08 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Pursuant to the South Carolina Notice and Opportunity to Cure Construction Dwelling Defects Act by NVR, Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/29/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Stair, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Consent Order to Stay Pursuant to the RTC Act
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Harrison Stair on behalf of NVR, Inc (Stair, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/18 11:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Heather Freeborough, Brett Freeborough. NVR, Inc. served 12/4/24, answer due 2/3/25. (Baum, John-Paul) Modified on 12/18/2024: to add text (name of defendant, served and answer dates) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/18/2024: to replace with corrected document (signed notice of filing) as provided by filing user). (Attachment added on 12/18/2024: #1 Waiver of Service) (kmca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 12/04 3:09 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Heather Freeborough and Brett Freeborough. (alma, )
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/04 3:08 PM
COMPLAINT against NVR, Inc ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12136795.), filed by Heather Freeborough and Brett Freeborough. Service due by 3/4/2025. (alma, )
Related: [-]