Arizona District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-04415
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 05, 2024 12:42 AM MST
Defendant
Jeffery Monroe Lashley (1)
Represented By
Luke Stephen Mulligan
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Dondi Jean Osborne
Us Attorneys Office - Flagstaff, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/05/2024 2:22 AM MST
Monday, December 02, 2024
Arrest of Jeffery M Lashley on 12/2/2024. (CSD)
Related: [-]
1 1 REDACTED CITATIONS (CSD)
Related: [-]