Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Stafford
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:24-cv-13217
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2025 5:02 AM EST
Defendant
Social Security Administration
Interested Party
(Court Use Only) SSA Notification - Office of General Counsel
Represented By
(Court Use Only) SSA Notification - Office of Gene
Ssa-Office Of The General Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Azar Sadeghi-Staffeld
341 Corrie Road
Ann Arbor, MI 48105


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/22 10:00 AM
REPLY to Response re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Social Security Administration. (Doyle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
10 10 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/11 4:37 PM
RESPONSE to8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Azar Sadeghi-Staffeld. [SUBMITTED THROUGH PRO SE PORTAL] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, March 20, 2025
9 9 order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Thu 03/20 4:46 PM
ORDER Requiring Response to8 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 4/10/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DAll)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 03/20 4:49 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re9 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Azar Sadeghi-Staffeld at 341 Corrie Road, Ann Arbor MI 48105 (DAll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss Thu 03/06 9:03 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Social Security Administration. (Doyle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Final Agency Decision,
Att: 3 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial,
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of Virginia Pizza
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 order Extend Time to - Free Tue 02/04 5:20 PM
ORDER to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to1 Complaint. Response due by 3/6/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DAll)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Tue 02/04 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Doyle on behalf of Social Security Administration. (Doyle, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Tue 12/10 1:20 PM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DAll)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Tue 12/10 11:32 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
notice Notice of New SSA Case Filing Fri 12/06 10:10 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of New Case Filing to Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Michigan. (JHea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Fri 12/06 10:09 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Azar Sadeghi-Staffeld. (JHea)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 12/06 10:08 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Azar Sadeghi-Staffeld against Social Security Administration (JHea)
Related: [-]