Original Case: 2:22-cv-02220

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03186
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 5:11 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
CARLA BOYD
Represented By
Christopher John Drinkwine
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Brian M. Smith
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF URBANA, ILLINOIS
Represented By
Christopher John Drinkwine
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Brian M. Smith
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CAROL MITTEN
Represented By
Christopher John Drinkwine
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Brian M. Smith
HEYL, ROYSTER, VOELKER & ALLEN, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WEINER COMPANIES, LTD.
Represented By
Brian T. Schurter
TUMMELSON, BRYAN & KNOX
contact info
Robert E. Jacobson
FLYNN, PALMER, TAGUE, LYKE & JACOBSON
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DALE KRAMER
Defendant - Appellee
CHERIS KRAMARAE
Defendant - Appellee
502 W. MAIN STREET, LLC
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARLES HORN
Represented By
Charles Horn
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/27/2025 5:10 AM CDT
Monday, December 02, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 12/16/2024. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Charles Horn by 12/09/2024. Fee or IFP forms due on 12/16/2024 for Appellant Charles Horn. [1] [7421185] 24-3186 (FP) [Entered: 12/03/2024 11:32 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Fee Notice
Att: 4 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellees 502 W. Main Street, LLC, Cheris Kramarae and Dale Kramer, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [7421199] 24-3186 (FP) [Entered: 12/03/2024 11:46 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7421205] d [3] [7421205] 24-3186 (FP) [Entered: 12/03/2024 11:51 AM]
Related: [-]