Original Case: 4:24-cv-00319

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03437
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 07, 2025 9:01 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
Susan Larson Christensen
Defendant - Appellee
P.J. Badding
Defendant - Appellee
J. Buller
Defendant - Appellee
S.J. Danilson
Defendant - Appellee
Sarah Elizabeth Crane
Plaintiff - Appellant
Hussein S. Yousif, I
Represented By
Hussein S. Yousif I
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/07/2025 9:01 AM CST
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
Civil case docketed. [5462438] 24-3437 (RDB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs ProSe Docketing Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs ProSe NDA
9 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 11/1/2024, Judgment dated 11/1/2024, Order dated 11/27/2024 [5462445] 24-3437 (RDB)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK ORDER:The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 12/31/2024, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [5462446] 24-3437 (RDB)
Related: [-]