Original Case: 1:23-cv-01765

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01476
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 05, 2024 1:19 AM MST
Defendant - Appellee
THE SUPREME COURT OF COLORADO, and the Justices thereof, in their official capacities
Represented By
LeeAnn Morrill
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By
Ronald J. Tomassi
Leon Cosgrove
contact info
Harrison Jensen Meyers
Leon Cosgrove
contact info
Gregory Scott Carter
Messner Reeves
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HOLLY MACINTYRE
Represented By
Holly MacIntyre
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/05/2024 1:19 AM MST
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
[11141016] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/03/2024. Fee or ifp forms due 01/02/2025 for Holly MacIntyre. Notice of appearance due on 12/17/2024 for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and The Supreme Court of Colorado, and Notice of appearance due on 01/02/2025 for Holly MacIntyre. Disclosure statement due on 12/17/2024 for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. 24-1476
Related: [-]
Att: 1 69 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil Habeas