Idaho District Court
Judge:Raymond Edward Patricco,
Case #: 1:24-cv-00583
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 2:46 AM MST
Defendant
Joseph R. Rockstahl
Defendant
Does 1 through 50 Inclusive
Plaintiff
Rockstahl Law Office, Chtd.
an Idaho professional service corporation 864 Filer Avenue
Twin Falls, ID 83301
Plaintiff
Daniel Madalena
Represented By
Angelo Luigi Rosa
Rosa PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/11 1:46 PM
ORDER EXTENDING SERVICE DEADLINE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall properly serve Defendants and file proof of that service with the Court by May 12, 2025. Failure to file proof of service with the Court by this deadline may result in the dismissal of the action against Defendants without prejudice. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/06 10:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Joseph R. Rockstahl, Rockstahl Law Office, Chtd.. (Print attached Summons for service.)(ac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, December 05, 2024
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/05 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Joseph R. Rockstahl, Rockstahl Law Office, Chtd. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIDDC-2850410.), filed by Daniel Madaelna.(Rosa, Angelo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons (Joseph R. Rockstahl),
Att: 3 Summons Summons (Rockstahl Law Office, Chtd.)