Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Campbell Barker
Case #: 6:24-cv-00445
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2024
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 3:44 AM CST
Defendant
Mack Humphreys
Defendant
Heather Humphreys Hall
11320 Spur 248
Tyler, TX 75707
Plaintiff
NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By
Crystal Gee Gibson
Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 order Judgment Wed 04/30 11:30 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing against Heather Humphreys Hall and Mack Humphreys. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 4/30/2025. (ndc)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/30 11:30 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for entry of an agreed judgment. Plaintiff is ordered to file any motion for attorneys' fees within 14 days of this order. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 4/30/2025. (ndc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/21 11:27 AM
JOINT MOTION to Enter Agreed Judgment by NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.(Gibson, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 26, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Fri 12/27 2:52 PM
Letter from Mack Humphreys (jbe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/23 4:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Heather Humphreys Hall.(wea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, December 16, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/16 12:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Mack Humphreys served on 12/11/2024. (Gibson, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/10 3:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Heather Humphreys Hall served on 12/9/2024. (Gibson, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order Thu 12/05 4:10 PM
ORDER REGULATING PRACTICE (gsm)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 12/05 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Mack Humphreys, Heather Humphreys Hall.(ndc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 12/05 2:19 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Gibson, Crystal)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/05 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10534886.), filed by NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.(Gibson, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 12/05 4:09 PM
District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (gsm)
Related: [-]