Juan Valencia v. Bradmore Realty Investment Company LTD. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-10480 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 2:25 AM PST |
Defendant
Bradmore Realty Investment Company LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Juan Valencia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Juan Valencia. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Bradmore Realty Investment Company LTD. (iv) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Juan Valencia. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Juan Valencia. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Juan Valencia. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38701978 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Juan Valencia(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |