Oregon District Court
Judge:Karin J Immergut
Case #: 3:24-cv-02027
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 3:12 AM PST
Defendant
Rocky Mountain Mechanical, Inc.
Defendant
Loren Ward
Plaintiff
Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund
Represented By
Noah T. Barish
Mckanna Bishop Joffe, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Supplemental Pension Trust
Represented By
Noah T. Barish
Mckanna Bishop Joffe, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund
Represented By
Noah T. Barish
Mckanna Bishop Joffe, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheet Metal Workers Local 103
Represented By
Noah T. Barish
Mckanna Bishop Joffe, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
12 12 oth_sup Declaration Tue 04/15 5:59 PM
Declaration of Noah Barish . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Barish, Noah)
Related: [-] Motion for default judgment11 .
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
11 11 motion Default Judgment Tue 04/15 5:48 PM
Motion for Default Judgment . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Barish, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
10 10 oth_evt Clerks Entry of Default Mon 03/10 1:30 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Rocky Mountain Mechanical, Inc., and Loren Ward Related [+]. (jy)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for default
9 9 oth_sup Declaration Mon 03/10 12:49 PM
Declaration of Noah Barish In Support of Motion for Entry of Default Order by Clerk . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Barish, Noah)
Related: [-] Motion for default8 .
8 8 motion Default Entry Mon 03/10 12:47 PM
Motion for Entry of Default Order By Clerk Against All Defendants . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Barish, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/29 4:57 PM
Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,3 upon Rocky Mountain Mechanical, Inc. served on 12/23/2024, answer due on 1/13/2025 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Barish, Noah)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/29 4:56 PM
Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued5 upon Loren Ward served on 12/23/2024, answer due on 1/13/2025 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Barish, Noah)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 12/09 10:39 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Loren Ward. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons Mon 12/09 10:15 AM
Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Barish, Noah)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 12/06 10:00 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Rocky Mountain Mechanical, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Fri 12/06 9:58 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 4/7/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/5/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 5/5/2025. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (gd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/05 1:06 PM
Complaint. for Damages and Injunctive Relief Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9670989 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Supplemental Pension Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 103, Northwest Sheet Metal Workers Welfare Fund against All Defendants. (Barish, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Rocky Mountain,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Loren Ward