Colorado District Court
Judge:Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:24-cv-03375
Nature of Suit625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 2:45 AM MST
Defendant
2019 BMW M5 Sedan, VIN WBSJF0C54KB285750
Defendant
2022 Ford F350 Super Duty Crew Cab Platinum, VIN 1FT8W3BT7NED66557
Defendant
Approximately $1,798.00 in United States currency
Defendant
Approximately $190,094.00 in United States currency
Defendant
Approximately $2,354.00 in United States currency
Defendant
Rolex Datejust 116300 Watch, S/N: 271852N0
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kurt J. Bohn
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
24 24 motion Forfeiture of Property Wed 05/14 2:42 PM
MOTION for Forfeiture of Property for Final Order of Forfeiture for a Certain Defendant Asset by Plaintiff USA.(Bohn, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only),
Att: 2 Proposed Document
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
23 23 respoth Claim Tue 05/13 12:00 PM
CLAIM by Claimant Natalie Kaye Thompson. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/29 12:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER. For good cause shown, and without awaiting a response the plaintiff, see D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d), the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Claimant Natalie Thompson and Request for Removal of ECF Notifications. ECF No.21 . Adam M. Tucker's representation of Claimant Thompson in this case is hereby terminated. After docketing this Minute Order, the Clerk of Court shall remove his information from the case caption and remove his email address so that he does not receive future Notices of Electronic Filing from this civil action. Upon receipt, Mr. Tucker shall forward a copy of this Minute Order and the Minute Order setting the Scheduling Conference to Claimant Thompson, ECF No.20 . Claimant Thompson is personally responsible for complying with all Court orders, including the upcoming Scheduling Conference. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/29/2025.(amona,)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/28 1:51 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Adam Tucker by Claimant Natalie Kaye Thompson.(Tucker, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
20 20 order Minute Order Wed 04/16 8:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Status Report submitted by the parties, ECF No.19 , the Court sets a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference before this Court on June 3, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-205, on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/27/2025. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/16/2025. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 04/14 10:57 AM
STATUS REPORT April 14, 2025 by Plaintiff USA. (Bohn, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
18 18 misc Status Report Fri 02/14 9:05 AM
STATUS REPORT February 14, 2025 by Plaintiff USA. (Bohn, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/13 11:03 AM
NOTICE Second Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Bohn, Kurt)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/13 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF PUBLICATION by Plaintiff USA(Bohn, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Declaration of Publication
Monday, February 10, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/10 7:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, Attorney Jacek W. Lentz added to party Brooke Garcia(pty:clm) by Brooke Garcia.(Lentz, Jacek)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/10 7:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, Attorney Jacek W. Lentz added to party Jerome Samarjian(pty:clm) by Jerome Samarjian.(Lentz, Jacek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/21 10:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by 2022 Ford F350 Super Duty Crew Cab Platinum, VIN 1FT8W3BT7NED66557.(Tucker, Adam)
Related: [-]
12 12 respoth Claim Tue 01/21 4:15 PM
CLAIM by Claimant Natalie Kaye Thompson.(Tucker, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Claim form
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 01/21 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Claimant by Adam Michael Tucker on behalf of Natalie Kaye Thompson, 2022 Ford F350 Super Duty Crew Cab Platinum, VIN 1FT8W3BT7NED66557Attorney Adam Michael Tucker added to party Natalie Kaye Thompson(pty:clm), Attorney Adam Michael Tucker added to party 2022 Ford F350 Super Duty Crew Cab Platinum, VIN 1FT8W3BT7NED66557(pty:dft) (Tucker, Adam)
Related: [-]
10 10 respoth Claim Tue 01/21 11:30 AM
CLAIM by Claimant Jerome Samarjian. (Lentz, Jacek)
Related: [-]
9 9 respoth Claim Tue 01/21 11:24 AM
CLAIM by Claimant Brooke Garcia. (Lentz, Jacek)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
8 8 misc Reassigning Judge Mon 01/06 4:27 PM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Chung at the end of the civil action number (such as 24-cv-03375-CYC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Chung in Courtroom C-205 in the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse, 1961 Stout St, Denver, CO 80294. If previously directed to contact Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty or his Chambers, Parties shall instead contact Chung Chambers at the following telephone number or email address: 303-335-2761 and Chung_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (Text only entry) (schap, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
7 7 order Minute Order Fri 12/13 10:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER: This case has been directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(c). The parties shall promptly complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form. ECF3 . It is hereby ordered that a Status Report is to be filed with the Court every sixty days , the first of which is due on or before February 14, 2025 . The first Status Report should address whether there is any need for scheduling discovery in this matter. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/13/2024. Text Only Entry (mehlc8)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/12 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Bohn, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
5 5 order Warrant Issued Fri 12/06 3:49 PM
WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Warrant for Arrest of Property Fri 12/06 3:46 PM
ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/6/2024. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 12/05 3:15 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 12/05 3:15 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/05 2:38 PM
COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against 2019 BMW M5 Sedan, VIN WBSJF0C54KB285750, 2022 Ford F350 Super Duty Crew Cab Platinum, VIN 1FT8W3BT7NED66557, Approximately $1,798.00 in United States currency, Approximately $190,094.00 in United States currency, Approximately $2,354.00 in United States currency, Rolex Datejust 116300 Watch, S/N: 271852N0 Attorney Kurt J. Bohn added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA.(Bohn, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only),
Att: 2 Warrant for Arrest of Property,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet