California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00720
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 05, 2024 11:19 PM PST
Defendant
Emmanuel Perez Lugo (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph Sebastian Guzman
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/06/2024 12:04 AM PST
Friday, November 22, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Emmanuel Perez Lugo in violation of 18:922(g). Approved by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg as to Emmanuel Perez Lugo (1). (jb) [2:24-mj-07066-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Emmanuel Perez Lugo. (jb) [2:24-mj-07066-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
4 4 INDICTMENT Filed as to Emmanuel Perez Lugo (1) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in Los Angeles. (mat)
Related: [-]
6 6 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Joseph S. Guzman as to Defendant Emmanuel Perez Lugo; defendants Year of Birth: 1981 (mat)
Related: [-]
7 7 GOVERNMENT'S NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Emmanuel Perez Lugo. (mat)
Related: [-]