Mississippi Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00052
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 1:15 AM CST
Defendant
Joel Alexander Corvera (2)
Represented By
Craig Thomas Rose - FPD
Federal Public Defender - Gulfport
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Elias Wences (1)
Represented By
Craig Thomas Rose - FPD
Federal Public Defender - Gulfport
contact info
T. Michael Reed
T. Michael Reed, Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lee Smith-Federal Gov
U. S. Department Of Justice - Gulfport
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/06/2024 1:59 AM CST
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
Set Hearings as to Carlos Elias Wences, Joel Alexander Corvera: Initial Appearance set for 12/4/2024 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. (KPM)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker:Initial Appearance as to Carlos Elias Wences, Joel Alexander Corvera held on 12/4/2024. Defendants were sworn and were advised of their rights, the charges against them, and maximum penalties. Defendant Corvera submitted a CJA Financial Affidavit and the court appointed the Federal Public Defender. A CJA Financial Affidavit was completed in open court for Defendant Wences and the court appointed the Federal Public Defender. The Public Defenders office will contact a panel attorney to represent Defendant Wences. The government moved for detention as to both defendants. Defendant Corvera moved to continue the preliminary and detention hearings and the hearings for both defendants were set for 12/5/24 at 2:30 pm. Defendants were remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. APPEARANCES: Lee Smith, AUSA; Craig Rose, AFPD; Jason Alexis, USPO; Laura Reagan, BJ Nix, and Stephen Newell, DUSM; Joseph Johnson, CSO. Tape Number: Audio 12.4.24. (KPM)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Carlos Elias Wences (1), Joel Alexander Corvera (2). (KPM)
Related: [-]
4 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Carlos Elias Wences. (KPM)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Carlos Elias Wences (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 4, 2024 (KPM)
Related: [-]
6 6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Joel Alexander Corvera. (KPM)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER granting6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Joel Alexander Corvera (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 4, 2024 (KPM)
Related: [-]
10 10 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/4/24 in case as to Carlos Elias Wences. (KPM)
Related: [-]
11 11 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/4/24 in case as to Joel Alexander Corvera. (KPM)
Related: [-]
12 12 *RESTRICTED* CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joel Alexander Corvera (KPM)
Related: [-]
13 13 *RESTRICTED* CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Carlos Elias Wences (KPM)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Joel Alexander Corvera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 4, 2024 (KPM)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Carlos Elias Wences. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 4, 2024 (KPM)
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Joel Alexander Corvera. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 12/5/2024 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 4, 2024 (KPM)
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Carlos Elias Wences. Prelimuinary and Detention Hearings set for 12/5/2024 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 4, 2024 (KPM)
Related: [-]