Original Case: 1:23-cv-02701

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvpri-07182
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 13, 2025 8:02 AM EST
Petitioner - Appellee
Blasket Renewable Investments LLC
Represented By
Matthew Scott Rozen
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Matthew D. McGill
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
Kingdom of Spain
Represented By
Joseph D. Pizzurro
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP
contact info
Kevin Arthur Meehan
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP
contact info
Juan Otoniel Perla
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/13/2025 8:02 AM EST
Thursday, December 05, 2024
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 24-7182
Related: [-]
10 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2088132] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:23-cv-02701-RC filed by Kingdom of Spain. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-7182 24-7182
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2088138] filed consolidating cases 24-7182 (Consolidation started 12/05/2024) with 24-7166 24-7166 24-7182
Related: [-]