Sakelaridis v. Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lashann Dearcy Hall |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-08387 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 3:44 AM EST |
Defendant
AAA Freight Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AAA Freight, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Aleksandar Petrovic
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vikings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Penske Truck Leasing Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Sakelaridis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Tue 04/01 2:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Counsel present by telephone. New counsel has appeared for defense counsel. No new parties or claims will be added. Fact discovery deadline 6/12/25. Expert discovery deadline extended to a date to be set after the completion of fact discovery and mediation, if the case hasn't settled. Next conference 6/12/25 at 10:30 (tel)(same dial-in number and access code)(close of fact discovery).Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2025 re12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery joint letter to Hon. DeArcy Hall filed by Vikings, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Aleksandar Petrovic (Levy, Robert) |
||
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Payne on behalf of Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Aleksandar Petrovic, Vikings, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Payne, Jeffrey) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Felice Jill Cotignola (Cotignola, Felice) |
|
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery joint letter to Hon. DeArcy Hall by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Aleksandar Petrovic, Vikings, LLC. (Cotignola, Felice) |
|
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/10 9:49 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy no longer assigned as presider to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (DA) |
||
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined
Fri 03/07 2:31 PM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (JM) |
||
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Mon 01/27 4:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy Philip Reid, Robyn Leader. Case management order approved, with fact discovery completion date set at 4/30/25. Next conference 4/1/25 at 2:00 pm (same dial-in number and access code)(status).Initial Conference Hearing held on 1/27/2025 (Levy, Robert) |
||
Friday, January 17, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ATTORNEY QUESTIONNAIRES (Leader, Robyn) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Jacqueline Leader on behalf of Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Vikings, LLC, Aleksandar Petrovic (aty to be noticed) (Leader, Robyn) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Vikings, LLC, Aleksandar Petrovic (Cotignola, Felice) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for January 27, 2025 at 4:00 PM , before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at 571-353-2301; Guest ID: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 12/13/2024. (JM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Maria Sakelaridis |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Reid on behalf of Maria Sakelaridis (aty to be noticed) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CV) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. d/b/a Penske Leasing and Rental Company, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation d/b/a Penske Leasing and Rental Company, Vikings, LLC, Aleksandar Petrovic re1 Notice of Removal,, Declaration of Service (Cotignola, Felice) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. d/b/a Penske Leasing and Rental Company, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation d/b/a Penske Leasing and Rental Company, Vikings, LLC, Aleksandar Petrovic identifying Corporate Parent Penske Automotive Group, Inc., a public company, owns a 28.92% limited partnership interest in plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. (PTL). Mitsui & Co., Ltd., a public company, owns 100% of MBK USA Holdings, Inc., which owns 100% of MBK USA Commercial Vehicles, Inc., which owns a 30% limited partnership interest in PTL. Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary of Penske Corporation. Penske Corporation, a public company, owns 41.08%; Mitsui & Co., Ltd., a public company, owns 30%; and Penske Automotive, a public company, owns 28.92% for Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. d/b/a Penske Leasing and Rental Company, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation d/b/a Penske Leasing and Rental Company. (Cotignola, Felice) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. d/b/a Penske Leasing and Rental Company, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation d/b/a Penske Leasing and Rental Company, Vikings, LLC, Aleksandar Petrovic from Queens, case number 715077/2024. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18557796) (Cotignola, Felice) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 12/06 4:11 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV) |
||
misc
ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal
Fri 12/06 4:23 PM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (CV) |