Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-03389

South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:L Jefferson Davis IV
Case #: 2:24-ap-80055
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2024

Debtor
Murden Construction, LLC
846 Dupont Road, Suite E
Charleston, SC 29407
Represented By
Murden Construction, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc.
Represented By
Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Campbell, Trustee
890 Johnnie Dodds Blvd PO Box 684
Mt. Pleasant, SC 29465
Represented By
Michael H. Conrady
contact info
Trustee
Kevin Campbell
PO Box 684
Mount Pleasant, SC 29465


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Sunday, May 04, 2025
15 15 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Mon 05/05 12:19 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 05/04/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, May 02, 2025
14 14 order Consent Order Fri 05/02 12:39 PM
Order Extending Time To File Adversary Proceeding Report. Document Served JD Related [+]. (Ting, K)
Related: [-] 13 ,11
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 misc Proposed Order Thu 05/01 4:58 PM
Proposed Order RE: Initial Adversary Proceeding Case Management Order. Document Served. Monitor deadline: 5/1/2025 Filed by Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc. Related [+]. (DeMott, Russell)
Related: [-] 11
Saturday, April 12, 2025
12 12 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Sun 04/13 12:18 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/12/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 order Complete Adversary Proceeding Report (order) Thu 04/10 3:43 PM
Initial Adversary Proceeding Case Management Order. Document Served. Monitor deadline: 5/1/2025 (Barnello, P)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/24 9:56 AM
Certificate of Service RE: Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc.. The filing party has verified that parties required to receive notice have received notice by Notice of Electronic Filing and has provided notice to other parties listed in the attached Certificate of Service. Filed by Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc. Related [+]. (DeMott, Russell)
Related: [-] 9
Saturday, March 22, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Sat 03/22 10:10 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc.. (DeMott, Russell)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, March 06, 2025
8 8 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Fri 03/07 12:21 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 03/06/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 order Consent Order Tue 03/04 12:41 PM
Consent Order Extending Time To File An Answer Document Served JD Related [+]. (Ting, K)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 misc Proposed Order Tue 03/04 8:10 AM
Proposed Order RE: Reissued Summons on Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc. Answer Due 3/7/2025 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). Extension of Time to file Answer Filed by Michael H. Conrady on behalf of Kevin Campbell, Trustee. Related [+]. (Conrady, Michael)
Related: [-] 4
utility Reset Answer Deadline Tue 03/04 12:44 PM
Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 3/22/2025. (Ting, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/14 1:34 PM
Certificate of Service RE: Summons Reissued. Filed by Michael H. Conrady on behalf of Kevin Campbell, Trustee. Related [+]. (Conrady, Michael)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons Reissued Wed 02/05 11:14 AM
Reissued Summons on Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc. Answer Due 3/7/2025 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days) . (Ting, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
3 3 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Tue 02/04 1:19 PM
Request for Reissued Summons Filed by Kevin Campbell, Trustee (Conrady, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Fri 12/06 2:53 PM
Summons Issued on Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc. Answer Due 1/6/2025 (except that the United States and its offices and agencies shall have 5 additional days). (Ting, K)
Related: [-]
utility Add Trustee Fri 12/06 2:49 PM
Kevin Campbell added to case. (Ting, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/05 2:55 PM
Adversary case 24-80055 Complaint by Kevin Campbell, Trustee against Buck Lumber and Building Supply, Inc. Core Proceeding. Fee: 350.00. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference), 14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Conrady, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet