Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Referred: Jacqueline M Deluca
Case #: 4:24-cv-03223
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Case in other court:District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, CI 24-03875
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 2:45 AM CST
Defendant
Lower Platte South Natural Resources District
Represented By
Susan M. Foster
Baylor, Evnen, Wolfe Law Firm
contact info
Torrey J. Gerdes
Baylor, Evnen, Wolfe Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
McKenzie Barry
Represented By
Kathleen M. Neary
Powers Law Firm
contact info

GPO Jan 14 2025
PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, Filing No. 7, the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 oth_doc Certificate Fri 03/07 10:28 AM
Certificate of Service for Defendant's Interrogatories to the Plaintiff and Defendant's Requests for Production of Documents to the Plaintiff by Attorney Susan M. Foster on behalf of Defendant Lower Platte South Natural Resources District.(Foster, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
11 11 oth_doc Certificate Fri 02/14 1:16 PM
Certificate of Service for Defendant's Rule 26a1 Disclosures by Attorney Susan M. Foster on behalf of Defendant Lower Platte South Natural Resources District.(Foster, Susan)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/14 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Service Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures and Disclosures of Nonexpert Witnesses by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Plaintiff McKenzie Barry (Neary, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
9 9 order Protective Order Tue 01/14 10:12 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, Filing No.7 , the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW) Tue 01/14 10:09 AM
FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due October 17, 2025. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on November 4, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 oth_doc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 01/13 10:20 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Susan M. Foster on behalf of Defendant Lower Platte South Natural Resources District.(Foster, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
6 6 oth_evt Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx Mon 12/16 10:08 AM
RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS - WebEx. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (ADB)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/16 10:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/13/2025.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (ADB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
4 4 oth_ans Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 12/13 11:15 AM
ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,1 by Lower Platte South Natural Resources District (Foster, Susan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/11 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant Lower Platte South Natural Resources District (Gerdes, Torrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Fri 12/06 1:35 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 12/06 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against McKenzie Barry from District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 24-3875 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5212660) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Susan M. Foster on behalf of Lower Plate South Natural Resources District(Foster, Susan)
Related: [-]