Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Referred: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Case #: 1:24-cv-24782
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Re-opened:Jul 17, 2024
Case in other court:Oklahoma Western, 5:24-cv-00677
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
BT Assets Group Inc
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Transaction Processing Services Inc
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Transact First Inc
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Justin Soulen
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Skylight Business Services LLC
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Michael Shvartsman
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Salt Money Inc
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Rocket Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Elena Popova
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Pepper Pay LLC
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
One Pay Cloud, LLC
21550 Biscayne Blvd Suite 400
Aventura, FL 33180
Represented By
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
OST LLC
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Oksana Moore
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
MG Family Trust
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Karla Knight
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Hanneliusknight Family Trust
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Eric Hannelius
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Encompany Inc
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Defendant
EnCompay, Inc.
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
EFT Business Services LLC
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Defendant
Bill My BNK LLC
Represented By
Neil David Kodsi
Feldman Kodsi
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Seth A. Day
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Jon Epstein
Hall Estillokc
contact info
Plaintiff
SNB Bank NA
Represented By
Evan G.E. Vincent
Crowe & Dunlevyokc
contact info
Eliot Pedrosa
Jones Day
contact info
Donald K. Shandy
Crowe & Dunlevyokc
contact info
Lawrence D. Rosenberg
Jones Day
contact info
Ryan E. Price
Sims Price & Price PLLC
contact info
Christine E. Cheung
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Shattuck Bancshares Inc
Represented By
Evan G.E. Vincent
Crowe & Dunlevyokc
contact info
Eliot Pedrosa
Jones Day
contact info
Donald K. Shandy
Crowe & Dunlevyokc
contact info
Lawrence D. Rosenberg
Jones Day
contact info
Ryan E. Price
Sims Price & Price PLLC
contact info
Christine E. Cheung
Jones Day
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
108 108 order Order on Motion to Take Deposition Thu 05/08 2:28 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. At this morning's hearing before the undersigned, the Parties informed me that they settled this action late last night. Accordingly, Plaintiffs'98 Motion to Take Deposition from Michael Shvartsman is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 5/8/2025. (mrg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
107 107 4 pgs respm Reply in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 6:55 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion re98 MOTION to Take Deposition from Michael Shvartsman . filed by Shattuck Bancshares Inc, SNB Bank NA. (Pedrosa, Eliot)
Related: [-]
106 106 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 3:06 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting105 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for attorney Dennis C. Vacco. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/1/2025. (koy)
Related: [-]
105 105 3 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 05/01 1:17 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Dennis C. Vacco. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18414753 by EnCompay, Inc., BT Assets Group Inc, EFT Business Services LLC, Encompany Inc, Hanneliusknight Family Trust, MG Family Trust, OST LLC, Pepper Pay LLC, Rocket Holdings, LLC, Salt Money Inc, Skylight Business Services LLC, Eric Hannelius, Transact First Inc, Transaction Processing Services Inc, Michael Shvartsman, Oksana Moore, Karla Knight, Elena Popova, Justin Soulen, Bill My BNK LLC. Responses due by 5/15/2025.(Kodsi, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Certification of Dennis C. Vacco,
Att: 2 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order granting Motion for Dennis C. Vacco to Appear Pro Hac Vice
104 104 2 pgs notice Notice of Compliance Thu 05/01 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order Dated April 28, 2025 by EnCompay, Inc., BT Assets Group Inc, EFT Business Services LLC, Encompany Inc, Hanneliusknight Family Trust, MG Family Trust, OST LLC, Pepper Pay LLC, Rocket Holdings, LLC, Salt Money Inc, Skylight Business Services LLC, Eric Hannelius, Transact First Inc, Transaction Processing Services Inc, Michael Shvartsman, Oksana Moore, Karla Knight, Elena Popova, Justin Soulen, Bill My BNK LLC re100 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,. Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party EnCompay, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party BT Assets Group Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party EFT Business Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Encompany Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Hanneliusknight Family Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party MG Family Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party OST LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Pepper Pay LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Rocket Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Salt Money Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Skylight Business Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Eric Hannelius(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Transact First Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Transaction Processing Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Michael Shvartsman(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Oksana Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Karla Knight (pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Elena Popova(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Justin Soulen(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Feldman added to party Bill My BNK LLC(pty:dft). (Feldman, Andrew)
Related: [-]