New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Ann Marie Donio
Case #: 1:24-cv-10959
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
CATHY FLEMING
Offit Kurman, P.A.
contact info
G. KEVIN FASIC
Law Offices Of G. Kevin Fasic
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSE CLAUSELL
Represented By
FRANKLIN ROOKS
Morgan Rooks, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/14 8:50 AM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion set for 5/5/2025 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Mon 04/14 9:47 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Request to Withdraw as Attorney20 filed by Cathy Fleming on 4/11/2025 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. Please be advised to use the motion event when filing a formal motion only. In the future, please use event *Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case* when remaining counsel is representing the party. This message is for informational purposes only. (tf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/11 12:21 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants. (FLEMING, CATHY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/08 4:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/9/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988 / 923 136 809#. Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2025. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 12/31/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/8/2025. (kes, )
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 04/08 1:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 4/8/2025. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, Court Conference Line) (sb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL I. GOLDBERG on behalf of BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC (GOLDBERG, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Fri 04/04 4:54 PM
Letter from G. Kevin Fasic re15 Letter.(FASIC, G.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Discovery Plan
Thursday, April 03, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Thu 04/03 4:21 PM
Letter from Franklin J. Rooks, Jr., Esquire.(ROOKS, FRANKLIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Joint Discovery Plan Draft
misc Docket Annotation (public) Thu 04/03 8:49 AM
NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 4/8/2025 Scheduling Conference. See Order dated 2/25/2025 and Text Order dated 3/20/2025. (sb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
14 14 order Order Thu 03/20 3:03 PM
TEXT ORDER: The in-person initial scheduling conference on 4/8/2025 at 11:00 A.M. shall be, and is hereby, CONVERTED to a TELEPHONIC initial scheduling conference. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-856-210-8988 / 675 791 655#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/20/2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E. GOODLEY on behalf of JOSE CLAUSELL (GOODLEY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/25 12:15 PM
FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC.(FLEMING, CATHY)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/25 11:59 AM
FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC.(FLEMING, CATHY)
Related: [-]
10 10 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Tue 02/25 10:19 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 02/25/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/24 10:07 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC.(FLEMING, CATHY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by G. KEVIN FASIC on behalf of BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC (FASIC, G.)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Wed 01/08 3:05 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Adjourning Time to Answer or Otherwise Move With Respect to the Complaint by 2/24/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/8/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 01/08 12:26 PM
STIPULATION by BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC. (FLEMING, CATHY)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CATHY FLEMING on behalf of BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC (FLEMING, CATHY)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/30 10:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE CLAUSELL. BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025. (ROOKS, FRANKLIN)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 12/09 11:41 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kes, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Mon 12/09 11:09 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by JOSE CLAUSELL as to BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC. (ROOKS, FRANKLIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against BYERS INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15856890) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOSE CLAUSELL.(ROOKS, FRANKLIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Consent to Join Collective Action
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 12/06 5:44 PM
Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)
Related: [-]