New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:24-cv-09323
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1346 U.S. Defendant
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Case in other court:State Court - Civil, SC-000242-23/BX
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 3:52 AM EST
Defendant
David Baskas DDS
Represented By
Brandon Herbert Cowart
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Defendant
Montefiore Hospital
Represented By
Brandon Herbert Cowart
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Defendant
Montefiore Medical Center
Represented By
Brandon Herbert Cowart
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Plaintiff
John Henry Farley, Jr.


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2025
4 4 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/03 3:31 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), as follows:1. The United States of America is substituted as defendant in place of the Federal Defendants. 2. Plaintiff's claims against the United States of America in this lawsuit are dismissed without prejudice. 3. This Stipulation and Order of Dismissal (the "Stipulation and Order") may be executed in counterparts; a reproduced signature shall have the same force and effect as an original signature; and a facsimile or electronic copy of the Stipulation and Order shall have the same force and effect as an original. 4. The undersigned parties understand and agree that the Stipulation and Order contains the entire agreement between them, and that no statements, representations, promises, agreements or negotiations, oral or otherwise, between the undersigned parties that are not included herein shall be of any force or effect. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 2/3/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
3 3 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 01/28 6:59 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Montefiore Hospital, Montefiore Medical Center, David Baskas DDS..(Cowart, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel - Limited Appearance Thu 01/16 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL for John Henry Farley, Jr...(Toes Keane, Susanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/09 11:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 12/09 12:05 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 12/09 12:13 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 12/09 12:14 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 12/09 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Judge Louis L. Stanton is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 12/06 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: SC-000242-23/BX..Document filed by David Baskas DDS, Montefiore Medical Center, Montefiore Hospital..(Cowart, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (A) State Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit (B) Employment Certification