Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:J Nicholas Ranjan
Case #: 2:24-cv-01669
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 5:09 AM EST
Defendant
ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION,
Plaintiff
MELINDA R. DETALLO
Represented By
Joseph H. Chivers
The Employment Rights Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Subst of Atty (Use to subst attys w/in the same firm) Fri 05/16 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Caralyn Marie Reese on behalf of ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION,. Attorney Danielle M. Parks terminated. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Caralyn
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
15 15 adr Neutral's Notice of ADR Proceeding Tue 05/13 10:15 AM
Notice of ADR proceeding: The litigants are advised that at the conclusion of the ADR process they must submit a completed questionnaire to the Clerk of Courts. The questionnaire is available on the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov and click on the ADR icon. Mediation Conference set for 6/3/2025 01:30 PM (White, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 04/04 11:12 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. David B. White is appointed as mediator. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/4/2025. (pak)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Case Management Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/04 11:11 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 4/18/2025; Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 5/2/2025; Discovery due by 8/29/2025. The parties shall file a joint status report by 7/1/2025, updating the Court on the status of discovery. A Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 9/3/2025 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. The dial-in information is as follows: 412-547-0144, with ana access code of 668597250#. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/4/2025. (pak)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Fri 04/04 11:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/4/2025. (Court Reporter: None) (pak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
11 11 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Tue 03/25 2:05 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION,. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 03/25 2:04 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/05 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Parks on behalf of ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION,. (Parks, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 03/04 10:26 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION,. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
7 7 order Case Management Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 03/03 1:40 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 3/25/2025. An Initial Case Management Conference is set for 4/4/2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 3/3/2025. (pak)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 12 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/28 10:12 AM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION,. (Presley, Marla)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 9 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/14 3:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, answer due 2/28/2025, filed by MELINDA R. DETALLO. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/24 4:02 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MELINDA R. DETALLO. ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, waiver sent on 12/18/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 12/17 10:29 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), I hereby recuse in the above-captioned matter and direct the Clerk of Court to reassign the case to another judge. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/17/2024. (mpg)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/17 11:18 AM
Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 12/10 4:09 PM
Summons Issued as to ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (jd)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Mon 12/09 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against ALLEGENT COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, (Filing fee $405, receipt number APAWDC-8595738), filed by Melinda R. DeTallo. (Chivers, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/10 4:03 PM
Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (jd)
Related: [-]