Vermont District Court
Judge:Geoffrey W Crawford
Case #: 2:24-cv-01350
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 3:57 AM EST
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
Plaintiff
Bethsy Lucia Ortiz Hermida
9450 SW Gemini Dr PMB 61963
Beaverton, OR 97008


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
3 3 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/19 1:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ur Jaddou (Greer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/06 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Bethsy Lucia Ortiz Hermida. (kp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 4:11 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou filed by Bethsy Lucia Ortiz Hermida. Summonses issued. (kp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet