District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Loren L Alikhan
Case #: 1:24-cv-03416
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
CYNTHIA PAT GOON OKOYE, SUCESSOR TRUSTEE
Defendant
GRINDSTONE UNIVERSAL LLC
Defendant
GROW CLUB LLC
Defendant
HAPPY-BUD WHOLESALER LLC
Defendant
KALIIVA CORP.
Defendant
KHOSSROW B. FAHIMI t/a SHIVA ELECTRONIC
Defendant
LA LA JUICE CORP. t/a APPLE DREAM
Defendant
M.J. JENNINGS ENTERPRISE LLC t/a RELVA
Defendant
DIANA CHU MOY
Defendant
EDDINGTON HAMM MOY
Defendant
1314 9TH STREET LLC t/a CHILL TOBACCO
Defendant
PEACE IN THE AIR LLC
Defendant
PRESS RELEASE VENTURES LLC t/a KUSH BAR
Defendant
JESSICA L. RACINE-WHITE, TRUSTEE
Defendant
TG CIGARS INC.
Represented By
Marlon C. Griffith
The Griffith Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
THOMAS A. HART
Defendant
VIBEZ PRINT LLC
Defendant
WELCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ELEVEN, LP
Defendant
WELCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FOUR, LP
Defendant
ZA PARTNERS LLC
Defendant
GEORGIA MIXED USE BUILDING LLC
Defendant
1314 1/2 INC.
Defendant
1748 COLUMBIA RD LLC
Defendant
1768 COLUMBIA ROAD N.W. ASSOCIATES LLC
Defendant
1770 COLUMBIA ROAD N.W. ASSOCIATES LLC
Defendant
2118 FSD PROPERTY LLC
Defendant
2337 18 ST LLC
Represented By
George L. Lyon, Jr.
Bergstrom Attorneys
contact info
Defendant
2337 BOND ST EQUITIES LLC
Defendant
448 K STREET LLC
Defendant
SOLEIMAN ASKARINAM
Represented By
George L. Lyon, Jr.
Bergstrom Attorneys
contact info
Defendant
JONATHAN ASKARINAM, TRUSTEE
Represented By
George L. Lyon, Jr.
Bergstrom Attorneys
contact info
Defendant
BLUE NILE REALTY LLC
Defendant
CAPITOL HEMP LLC
Defendant
DIXIE BARBARA CHINN
Represented By
Ian Andrew McLin
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Defendant
DREAMS LLC
Defendant
G LA LA JUICE t/a APPLE DREAM
Defendant
GALLERY ROW HOLDINGS LLC
Defendant
GAS MONKEY DC LLC t/a MONKO
Represented By
Joseph Larry Katz
Katz Law
contact info
Defendant
BEATRICIA CHU GOON, TRUSTEE
Petitioner
ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC
Represented By
Jon Lodwick Brunenkant
Brunenkant & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
33 33 service Electronic Summons Reissued Fri 05/16 7:47 AM
SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to 2337 BOND ST EQUITIES LLC (znmw)
Related: [-]
32 32 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Fri 05/16 1:27 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to 2337 Bond St Equities LLC for Amended Complaint filed by ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC.(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
28 28 service Certificate of Service Mon 05/12 7:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC, DC HOLISTIC WELLNESS GROUP LLC Third Certificate . (Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Certificate of Service Mon 05/12 7:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC, DC HOLISTIC WELLNESS GROUP LLC Second Certificate . (Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Certificate of Service Mon 05/12 7:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC, DC HOLISTIC WELLNESS GROUP LLC . (Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/09 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacobie Whitley on behalf of 1314 9TH STREET, LLC (Whitley, Jacobie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacobie Whitley on behalf of VIBEZ PRINT LLC (Whitley, Jacobie)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
31 31 misc Mail Returned Thu 05/15 7:56 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to 2337 BOND ST EQUITIES LLC. Type of Document Returned: Order23 entered on 4/21/2025 (new address not provided, unable to forward). (mhp)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Mail Returned Thu 05/15 7:52 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to VIBEZ PRINT LLC. Type of Document Returned: Order23 entered on 4/21/2025 (new address not provided, unable to forward). (mhp)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Mail Returned Thu 05/15 7:49 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to KALIIVA CORP. Type of Document Returned: Order23 entered on 4/21/2025 (new address not provided, unable to forward). (mhp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Lift Stay Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 04/21 5:57 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' motion to lift the stay, consolidate cases, and establish procedures22 ; directing Plaintiffs to serve their amended complaint21 on or before May 23, 2025; directing any Defendant who has not yet entered an appearance to do so on or before June 23, 2025; and denying the motions to dismiss filed by Defendant Gas Monkey DC LLC t/a Monko6 and Defendant TG Cigars Inc.9 as moot. See order for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 04/21/2025. (lclla2)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 04/21 5:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff is responsible for timely service of a summons and a copy of the complaint on each Defendant. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c). Plaintiff has failed to file proof of service on Defendant Grindstone Universal LLC. See generally Docket. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Grindstone Universal LLC is DISMISSED from this case, without prejudice, and the case will proceed against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 04/21/2025. (lclla2)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/22 11:15 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Time to effectuate service upon party (amended complaint21 ) due by 5/23/2025; Notice of Appearance by Defts (misc ddl) due by 6/23/2025. (mhp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
22 22 motion Lift Stay Fri 04/04 9:00 PM
MOTION to Lift Stay and for Consolidation and Establishment of Procedures and Procedural Schedule by DC HOLISTIC WELLNESS GROUP LLC, ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC.(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 14, 2025
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/14 3:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH CLASS ACTION ALTERNATIVE against All Defendants filed by ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC, DC HOLISTIC WELLNESS GROUP LLC.(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit REDLINED CHANGES
20 20 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 03/14 2:38 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LA LA JUICE CORP. t/a APPLE DREAM served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025 (Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
19 19 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Mon 03/03 1:40 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BLUE NILE REALTY LLC served on 3/3/2025, answer due 3/24/2025; GALLERY ROW HOLDINGS LLC served on 2/27/2025, answer due 3/20/2025; VIBEZ PRINT LLC served on 2/27/2025, answer due 3/20/2025(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 27, 2025
18 18 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Thu 02/27 9:31 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DREAMS LLC served on 1/5/2025, answer due 1/26/2025 (Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Thu 02/27 8:34 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. 1314 1/2 INC. served on 2/20/2025, answer due 3/13/2025; 1314 9TH STREET LLC t/a CHILL TOBACCO served on 2/19/2025, answer due 3/12/2025; KHOSSROW B. FAHIMI t/a SHIVA ELECTRONIC served on 2/4/2025, answer due 2/25/2025; M.J. JENNINGS ENTERPRISE LLC t/a RELVA served on 2/27/2025, answer due 3/20/2025(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
16 16 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Wed 02/19 6:50 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GROW CLUB LLC served on 2/3/2025, answer due 2/24/2025 (Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 01, 2025
15 15 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Sat 02/01 1:30 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BEATRICIA CHU GOON, TRUSTEE served on 1/31/2025, answer due 2/21/2025; DIANA CHU MOY served on 1/31/2025, answer due 2/21/2025; CYNTHIA PAT GOON OKOYE, SUCESSOR TRUSTEE served on 1/31/2025, answer due 2/21/2025; WELCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ELEVEN, LP served on 12/17/2024, answer due 1/7/2025; WELCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FOUR, LP served on 12/17/2024, answer due 1/7/2025(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Affidavit
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Order on Motion to Permit Wed 01/29 5:50 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to show proof of service upon Defendants Cynthia Pat Goon Okoye, Successor Trustee under the Wellington Hamm Moy Trust, Beatricia Chu Goon, Trustee under the Arthur and Beatricia Goon Trust, and Diana Chu Moy on or before March 10, 2025. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 01/29/2025. (lclla2)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Wed 01/29 12:54 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GEORGIA MIXED USE BUILDING LLC served on 1/2/2025, answer due 1/23/2025; PEACE IN THE AIR LLC served on 12/16/2024, answer due 1/6/2025; ZA PARTNERS LLC served on 12/17/2024, answer due 1/7/2025(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
order .Order Wed 01/29 5:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the court's January 14, 2025 order staying this case, Plaintiff is under no obligation to respond to the motion to dismiss9 filed by Defendant TG Cigars Inc. at this time. The court will set a deadline for any response after it lifts the stay. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 01/29/2025. (lclla2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/30 2:30 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Time to effectuate service upon party due by 3/10/2025. (mhp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Tue 01/28 1:35 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. 1748 COLUMBIA RD LLC served on 1/17/2025, answer due 2/7/2025; EDDINGTON HAMM MOY served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to Mon 01/27 1:36 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to COMPLETE ALTERNATIVE SERVICE by ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC.(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Sunday, January 26, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Sun 01/26 2:53 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. 2337 18 ST LLC served on 1/21/2025, answer due 2/11/2025; 2337 BOND ST EQUITIES LLC served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025; CAPITOL HEMP LLC served on 1/23/2025, answer due 2/13/2025(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 motion Dismiss Thu 01/16 2:50 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by TG CIGARS INC.. (Griffith, Marlon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
order .Order Tue 01/14 10:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Responses to Orders to Show Cause why Alliance of Legal Cannabis Entities-DC, LLC v. Mallios Realty LLC , 24-CV-2823, and Alliance of Legal Cannabis Entities-DC, LLC v. KRS LLC , 24-CV-2889, should not be consolidated with related cases, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until further order of the court. Accordingly, Defendants are relieved from any obligation to respond to the complaint1 until further order from the court. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Dixie Barbara Chinn's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint7 is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff is also relieved of any obligation to respond to the pending motion to dismiss6 , until further order from the court. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 1/14/2025. (lclla2)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Tue 02/04 3:36 PM
Case Stayed. (mhp)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/13 10:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by SOLEIMAN ASKARINAM, JONATHAN ASKARINAM, TRUSTEE, 2337 18 ST LLC.(Lyon, George)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/13 5:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond by DIXIE BARBARA CHINN.(McLin, Ian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 motion Dismiss Mon 01/13 4:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Statement of Points and Authorities in Support, by GAS MONKEY DC LLC t/a MONKO. (Katz, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 12, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 01/12 7:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by George L. Lyon, Jr on behalf of SOLEIMAN ASKARINAM, JONATHAN ASKARINAM, TRUSTEE, 2337 18 ST LLC (Lyon, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 01/03 11:40 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. 1768 COLUMBIA ROAD N.W. ASSOCIATES LLC served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025; 1770 COLUMBIA ROAD N.W. ASSOCIATES LLC served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025; 2118 FSD PROPERTY LLC served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025; 448 K STREET LLC served on 12/18/2024, answer due 1/8/2025; SOLEIMAN ASKARINAM served on 12/22/2024, answer due 1/12/2025; JONATHAN ASKARINAM, TRUSTEE served on 1/2/2025, answer due 1/23/2025; DIXIE BARBARA CHINN served on 12/23/2024, answer due 1/13/2025; G LA LA JUICE t/a APPLE DREAM served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025; GAS MONKEY DC LLC t/a MONKO served on 12/21/2024, answer due 1/11/2025; HAPPY-BUD WHOLESALER LLC served on 12/18/2024, answer due 1/8/2025; KALIIVA CORP. served on 12/18/2024, answer due 1/8/2025; PRESS RELEASE VENTURES LLC t/a KUSH BAR served on 12/18/2024, answer due 1/8/2025; JESSICA L. RACINE-WHITE, TRUSTEE served on 1/2/2025, answer due 1/23/2025; TG CIGARS INC. served on 12/18/2024, answer due 1/8/2025; THOMAS A. HART served on 1/2/2025, answer due 1/23/2025(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Affidavit,
Att: 5 Affidavit,
Att: 6 Affidavit,
Att: 7 Affidavit,
Att: 8 Affidavit,
Att: 9 Affidavit,
Att: 10 Affidavit,
Att: 11 Affidavit,
Att: 12 Affidavit,
Att: 13 Affidavit,
Att: 14 Affidavit
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 12/09 11:03 AM
SUMMONS (39) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants.(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/09 10:34 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Loren L. AliKhan. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 12/06 6:02 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC. Case related to Case No. 1:24-CV-02756. (Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
1 1 107 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 6:00 PM
COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BDCDC-11343470) filed by ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC, LLC.(Brunenkant, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons 448 K STREET LLC,
Att: 3 Summons 1314 1/2 INC.,
Att: 4 Summons 1314 9TH STREET LLC,
Att: 5 Summons 1748 COLUMBIA RD LLC,
Att: 6 Summons 1768 COLUMBIA ROAD NW ASSOCIATES LLC,
Att: 7 Summons 1770 COLUMBIA ROAD NW ASSOCIATES LLC,
Att: 8 Summons 2118 FSD PROPERTY LLC,
Att: 9 Summons 2337 BOND ST EQUITIES LLC,
Att: 10 Summons BEATRICIA CHU MOY, TRUSTEE,
Att: 11 Summons BLUE NILE REALTY LLC,
Att: 12 Summons 2337 18 ST LLC,
Att: 13 Summons CAPITOL HEMP LLC,
Att: 14 Summons CYNTHIA PAT GOON OKOYE, TRUSTEE,
Att: 15 Summons DIANA CHU MOY,
Att: 16 Summons DIXIE BARBARA CHINN,
Att: 17 Summons DREAMS LLC,
Att: 18 Summons EDDINGTON HAMM MOY,
Att: 19 Summons G LA LA JUICE CORP.,
Att: 20 Summons GALLERY ROW HOLDINGS LLC,
Att: 21 Summons GAS MONKEY DC LLC,
Att: 22 Summons GEORGIA MIXED USE BUILDING LLC,
Att: 23 Summons GRINDSTONE UNIVERSAL LLC,
Att: 24 Summons GROW CLUB LLC,
Att: 25 Summons HAPPY-BUD WHOLESALER LLC,
Att: 26 Summons JESSICA L. RACINE-WHITE,,
Att: 27 Summons JONATHAN ASKARINAM, TRUSTEE,
Att: 28 Summons KALIIVA CORP.,
Att: 29 Summons KHROSSROW B. FAHIMI,
Att: 30 Summons LA LA JUICE CORP.,
Att: 31 Summons M.J. JENNINGS ENTERPRISE LLC,
Att: 32 Summons PEACE IN THE AIR LLC,
Att: 33 Summons PRESS RELEASE VENTURES LLC,
Att: 34 Summons SOLEIMAN ASKARINAM,
Att: 35 Summons TG CIGARS INC.,
Att: 36 Summons THOMAS A. HART,
Att: 37 Summons VIBEZ PRINT LLC,
Att: 38 Summons WELCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ELEVEN, LP,
Att: 39 Summons WELCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FOUR, LP,
Att: 40 Summons ZA PARTNERS LLC