Colorado District Court
Judge:Charlotte N Sweeney
Case #: 1:24-cv-03398
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Case in other court:El Paso County District Court, 2024CV475
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 1:39 AM MST
Defendant
Peak Vista Community Health Centers
Represented By
Danyelle Semjonovs
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Matthew Joseph Hegarty
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Jefferson
[E-filer effective 1/15/2024] 6050 Tuckerman Lane
Colorado Springs, CO 80918


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
29 29 4 pgs motion Order Thu 05/08 6:48 PM
First MOTION for Order to OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL by Plaintiff Heather Jefferson. (Jefferson, Heather )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
28 28 order Minute Order Fri 05/02 7:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the filings in this case, defense counsel are ordered to review this Court's Uniform Civil Practice Standards. Specifically, CNS Civ. Practice Standard 10.1(a) which can be found[LINK:here] . All future filings shall be made in Arial 12-point font. The Court may summarily strike future filings that do not comply. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 5/2/2025. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
27 27 order Memorandum Fri 05/02 6:59 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding26 Motion to Compel Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 37. Motion26 is referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 5/2/2025. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
26 26 motion Compel Thu 05/01 1:06 PM
MOTION to Compel Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 37 by Defendant Peak Vista Community Health Centers.(Semjonovs, Danyelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - conferral letter
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
25 25 order Minute Order Wed 04/23 4:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' communications with chambers, Defendant shall file a motion to compel discovery on or before May 1, 2025, setting forth a specific list of documents and information it seeks. Plaintiff shall respond on or before May 8, 2025. Defendant shall reply on or before May 15, 2025. Each briefing shall be limited to five (5) pages . Finally, a Motion Hearing is set for May 19, 2025, at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. The Hearing will be conducted by video using the attached instructions. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/23/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc5)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
24 24 order Minute Order Fri 02/21 9:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER: A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/27/2026 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. The parties' Proposed Final Pretrial Order is due by 1/20/2026. In addition to filing, the parties are directed to email the proposed order in editable format to Sweeney_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 2/21/2025. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/20 7:28 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/29/2025. Ten (10) days after the close of discovery, a party seeking to file a motion for summary judgment must email Judge Sweeneys chambers to inform the Court of their intent to file such motion. Within 24 hours of the Scheduling Conference and/or issuance of the Scheduling Order, the parties shall jointly contact Judge Sweeneys chambers (Sweeney_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov) to set a date for Final Pretrial Conference. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 2/18/2025. (evaug)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 02/20 7:25 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held on 2/18/2025 before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. FTR: Courtroom 101. (evaug )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
21 21 order Minute Order Mon 01/27 9:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed the parties'20 Proposed Scheduling Order, the Court has determined that a scheduling conference is necessary. Accordingly, a Scheduling Conference is set for February 18, 2025, at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. The Conference will be conducted by video using the attached instructions. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 1/27/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc5)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
20 20 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 01/23 10:23 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order With Disputed Issues by Defendant Peak Vista Community Health Centers. (Semjonovs, Danyelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
19 19 misc Pro Se E-Filing Privileges Granted Wed 01/15 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF PRO SE E-FILING PRIVILEGES: Plaintiff, Heather Jefferson, sought and received e-filing privileges on 1/15/2025. All further service will be effectuated electronically via CM/ECF to the email address of record. (Text Only Entry) (lrobe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Tue 01/14 3:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's15 Motion to Amend Caption to Reflect Name Change. The Clerk of Court is directed to replace Heather Johnson with Heather Jefferson in the case caption. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 1/14/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc5)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/14 12:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by USPS by Clerk of Court re 16 Memorandum to Heather Johnson at 6050 Tuckerman Lane Colorado Springs, CO 80918. Text Only Entry (agryan)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Memorandum Tue 01/14 10:38 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding15 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify filed by Heather Johnson. Motion15 is referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 1/14/2025. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
15 15 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Tue 01/14 8:18 AM
MOTION to Amend Caption to Reflect Name Change by Plaintiff Heather Johnson. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Tue 01/14 8:14 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Heather Johnson (efoga, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
13 13 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 12/19 1:29 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for all motions . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Additionally, the parties are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Uniform Civil Practice Standards of both judicial officers assigned to this case which can be found[LINK:here] . By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 12/19/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Reassigning Case Thu 12/19 10:32 AM
CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-03398-CNS . (Text Only Entry) (jrobe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
11 11 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 12/19 9:37 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Heather Johnson All parties do not consent.(jrobe, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document
Friday, December 13, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/13 12:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Semjonovs, Danyelle)
Related: [-]
9 9 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/13 11:42 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to5 Complaint by Peak Vista Community Health Centers.(Semjonovs, Danyelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
8 8 4 pgs order Order Wed 12/11 3:44 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 2/3/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/3/2025. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 12/11/2024. (evaug)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
7 7 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 12/06 4:37 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 12/06 4:36 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 4:35 PM
CIVIL COMPLAINT against Peak Vista Community Health Centers, filed by Heather Johnson.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Fri 12/06 4:34 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Fri 12/06 4:33 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. Pursuant to Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a, each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry.) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 12/06 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Hegarty on behalf of Peak Vista Community Health CentersAttorney Matthew Joseph Hegarty added to party Peak Vista Community Health Centers(pty:dft) (Hegarty, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 12/06 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Peak Vista Community Health Centers from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 24CV475. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10023464), filed by Peak Vista Community Health Centers.(Semjonovs, Danyelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - EEOC Charge,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - El Paso County District Court Docket,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet