Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Case #: 1:24-cv-05580
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 5:43 AM EST
Defendant
RBC Bank (Georgia)
Represented By
Kyle Lee Dockendorf
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Michael Andrew Bittner
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
J. Carole Thompson Hord
Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DigitalDoors, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Scott Fuller
Garteiser Honea, PLLC
contact info
Randall Garteiser
Garteiser Honea, PLLC
contact info
Christopher A. Honea
Garteiser Honea, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
22 22 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 11:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:19 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 4/30/2025. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
21 21 motion Protective Order Mon 04/21 7:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by RBC Bank (Georgia).(Bittner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 04/15 10:27 AM
Submission of17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/14 4:20 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RBC Bank (Georgia).(Bittner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 04, 2025
19 19 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 04/04 1:53 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by DigitalDoors, Inc..(Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/31 10:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DigitalDoors, Inc..(Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A1 - First Horizon Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A2 - First Horizon Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - First Citizens Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Frost Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Cadence Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/10 5:00 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by RBC Bank (Georgia).(Bittner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/10 4:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RBC Bank (Georgia) identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Bank (Georgia). (Bittner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 01/28 11:34 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Randall Garteiser and Christopher A. Honea terminated as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 1/28/2025. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
14 14 30+ pgs order Order Tue 01/14 10:36 AM
STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 1/14/25. (vs)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
13 13 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/13 11:29 AM
ORDER granting the11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kyle Lee Dockendorf. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 1/13/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jbu)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/13 11:25 AM
ORDER granting the10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Andrew Bittner. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 1/13/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/13 11:27 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Michael Andrew Bittner re12 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/13 11:31 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Kyle Lee Dockendorf re13 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 01/08 9:00 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:10 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Andrew Bittner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13973316). Attorney Michael Andrew Bittner added appearing on behalf of RBC Bank (Georgia). E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 01/08 9:01 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:11 APPLICATION for Admission of Kyle Lee Dockendorf Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13973319). Attorney Kyle Lee Dockendorf added appearing on behalf of RBC Bank (Georgia). E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
11 11 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/07 5:55 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Kyle Lee Dockendorf Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13973319).by RBC Bank (Georgia). (Hord, J. Carole)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/07 5:53 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Andrew Bittner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13973316).by RBC Bank (Georgia). (Hord, J. Carole)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 01/06 3:39 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, RBC Bank (Georgia) Answer due 3/9/2025. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 1/6/2025. (jbu)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 01/06 3:08 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by RBC Bank (Georgia).(Hord, J. Carole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Wed 12/18 5:59 PM
Return of Service Executed by DigitalDoors, Inc.. RBC Bank (Georgia) served on 12/18/2024, answer due 1/8/2025. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
6 6 motion Withdraw As Attorney Mon 12/16 3:41 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Michael Scott Fuller as Attorneyby DigitalDoors, Inc..(Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order WITHDRAWING RANDALL GARTEISER AND CHRISTOPHER HONEA PURSUANT TO LETTER FROM CLERK
Friday, December 06, 2024
5 5 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 12/06 3:59 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Christopher A. Honea. Clerk to follow-up by 12/16/2024. (jas)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 12/06 3:58 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Randall Garteiser. Clerk to follow-up by 12/16/2024. (jas) Modified on 12/6/2024 letter sent (jas).
Related: [-]
3 3 misc A.O. Form 120 Fri 12/06 12:08 PM
AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 12/06 12:08 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to RBC Bank (Georgia). (tcc)
Related: [-]
1 1 115 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 12:05 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by DigitalDoors, Inc.. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13909348)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet