New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Elizabeth A Pascal
Case #: 1:24-cv-10973
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Terminated:Dec 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 4:14 AM EST
Defendant
JANE FOODIE LLC
Plaintiff
CSC BRANDS LP
Represented By
JEREMY A. COHEN
Braunhagey & Borden LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY
Represented By
JEREMY A. COHEN
Braunhagey & Borden LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, December 27, 2024
9 9 service Certificate of Service Fri 12/27 12:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY, CSC BRANDS LP re8 Judgment,, Order, (COHEN, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Judgment Order Thu 12/26 2:38 PM
ORDER of JUDGMENT and Dismissal in favor of Plaintiffs, CSC BRANDS LP, and THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY against Defendant JANE FOODIE LLC ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED, re7 Stipulation filed by CSC BRANDS LP, THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/24/2024. (kes, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 3 pgs misc Stipulation Mon 12/23 3:31 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER OF JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL by THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY, CSC BRANDS LP.(COHEN, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 1 pgs Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 service Certificate of Service Thu 12/12 6:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY, CSC BRANDS LP (COHEN, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 12/09 3:05 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANE FOODIE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (js)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Mon 12/09 3:01 PM
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 12/09 12:30 PM
Judge Edward S. Kiel and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (mmb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Mon 12/09 2:47 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (js)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 12/06 7:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY. (COHEN, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 12/06 7:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSC BRANDS LP identifying The Campbell's Company as Corporate Parent.. (COHEN, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 7:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15857364) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THE CAMPBELL'S COMPANY, CSC BRANDS LP.(COHEN, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment