Nebraska District Court
Judge:Jacqueline M Deluca
Case #: 4:24-cv-03224
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 2:45 AM CST
Defendant
Franchise Management Investors US, LLC
a Delaware Corporation 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Franchise Management, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jayda Minor
109 Cass St.
Griswold, IA 51535
Represented By
Eric B. Brown
Atwood, Holsten Law Firm
contact info
Jennifer L. Sturm, I
Atwood, Holsten Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
21 21 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Thu 05/15 4:43 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Margaret C. Hershiser on behalf of Defendant Franchise Management Investors US, LLC.(Hershiser, Margaret)
Related: [-]
20 20 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Thu 05/15 4:41 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Margaret C. Hershiser on behalf of Defendant Franchise Management, Inc..(Hershiser, Margaret)
Related: [-]
19 19 oth_evt Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx Thu 05/15 9:56 AM
RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS - WebEx. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (MKR)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order - Consent Thu 05/15 9:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER - CONSENT- Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 6/12/2025. Consent Deadline set for 6/12/2025.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (MKR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/14 4:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Franchise Management, Inc. (Hershiser, Margaret)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/14 4:55 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Franchise Management Investors US, LLC (Hershiser, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Fri 04/11 8:47 AM
TEXT ORDER granting14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before May 14, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TMM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Thu 04/10 3:03 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Patrice D. Ott on behalf of Defendants Franchise Management Investors US, LLC, Franchise Management, Inc..(Ott, Patrice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/25 3:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Franchise Management, Inc. defendant Franchise Management, Inc. on 3/6/2025. (Brown, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Thu 03/20 10:36 AM
TEXT ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before April 14, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TMM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Wed 03/19 2:55 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Patrice D. Ott on behalf of Defendants Franchise Management Investors US, LLC, Franchise Management, Inc..(Ott, Patrice)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/06 2:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Franchise Management Investors, US LLC defendant Franchise Management Investors US, LLC. (Sturm, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 03/06 11:06 AM
Summons Issued as to defendant Franchise Management, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Requested Thu 03/06 10:58 AM
Summons Requested as to Franchise Management Corp. regarding Complaint1 . (Sturm, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Thu 03/06 10:54 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted Franchise Management Corp. as to defendant Franchise Management Investors US, LLC. (Sturm, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/05 4:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Franchise Management Investors, US LLC defendant Franchise Management Investors US, LLC on 2/28/2025. (Brown, Eric)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Requested Wed 03/05 4:06 PM
Summons Requested as to Franchise Management Corp. regarding Complaint1 . (Brown, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 02/27 9:47 AM
Summons Issued as to defendants Franchise Management Investors US LLC and Franchise Management, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (RMR)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Requested Thu 02/27 9:08 AM
Summons Requested as to Franchise Management Investors, US LLC and Franchise Management Corp. regarding Complaint1 . (Brown, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Mon 12/09 8:50 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 11:58 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5213180), by Attorney Eric B. Brown on behalf of Jayda Minor(Brown, Eric)
Related: [-]