Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-03232
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 07, 2024 1:46 AM CST
Defendant
Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez (1)
Represented By
Reginald Van Wade
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nallely Duarte
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Feb 26 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic)
GPO Mar 20 2025
ORDER accepting re 22 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Ernest Gonzalez. (vg)

Docket last updated: 12/07/2024 4:11 AM CST
Monday, November 04, 2024
Arrest of Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez (drda) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez held on 11/6/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 11/12/2024 9:00AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Reginald Van Wade for Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez appointed. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 ORDER as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez, ( Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 11/20/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters,). Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez. (mgc) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Bond by Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez. (mgc) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
6 6 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Preliminary Hearing AND Detention Hearing as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez held on 11/20/2024. Probable cause found; Detention Ordered. (Court Reporter FTR GOLD- C LEVRIE.) (mgc) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL-GRANTING USA's ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to NO BOND as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez (1); DENYING DEFENDANT's ORAL Motion for Bond as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez (1). Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (mgc) [2:24-mj-03277-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
8 8 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
10 10 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Juan Carlos Villa-Velazquez (bot2)
Related: [-]