Washington Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-04336
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 07, 2024 12:15 AM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Benjamin David Seal
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jesus Humberto Torres-Lopez (1)
Terminated: 12/04/2024
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - YAK
Federal Defenders - Yak
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/07/2024 3:08 AM PST
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
1 1 6 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jesus Humberto Torres-Lopez (1). (PH, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Charges and Penalties as to Jesus Humberto Torres-Lopez (1). (PH, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Seal Complaint by USA as to Jesus Humberto Torres-Lopez (1). (PH, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting ECF NO.4 Motion to Seal Complaint as to Jesus Humberto Torres-Lopez (1). Signed by Judge Alexander C. Ekstrom. (PH, Case Administrator) Modified on 11/7/2024 to correct Judge. (PH, Case Administrator).
Related: [-]