Georgia Middle District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00038
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 09, 2024 2:12 AM EST
Defendant
KEMAREON BRYANT (8)
Represented By
MICHAEL GRANIMS
Federal Defenders Of The Middle District Of Georgia Inc
contact info
FEDERAL DEFENDERS MIDDLE DISTRICT OF GEORGIA INC
contact info
Defendant
ANGELA COOKLEY (3)
Defendant
JAYLEN FILMORE (4)
Defendant
JELAN HAYES (6)
Defendant
JERRY HAYES (5)
Defendant
DE'ANDRE KENTERRIOUS LAMARION MCCLARIN (1)
Defendant
KEMBRICK MCCLENDON (7)
Defendant
DANMON JERONE WILKERSON (2)
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
HANNAH COUCH
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2024
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Seal Document as to JERRY HAYES (5). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/6/2024. (ksl)
GPO Dec 09 2024
ORDER provides Notice to Defendant Bryant, as a named Defendant in the above-referenced Superseding Indictment, that he and his counsel are subject to the terms of the Protective Order as to KEMAREON BRYANT re 43 Order on Motion for Protective Order. Bryant shall have fourteen (14) days from entry of this Order within which to file any objection to the Protective Order. Any such objection shall be accompanied by a supporting brief. Responses by any party may be filed within seven (7) days following any objection by Defendant Bryant. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/9/2024. (ksl)
GPO Jan 09 2025
ORDER granting 46 Motion to Declare Case Complex as to DE'ANDRE KENTERRIOUS LAMARION MCCLARIN (1), DANMON JERONE WILKERSON (2), ANGELA COOKLEY (3), JAYLEN FILMORE (4), JERRY HAYES (5), JELAN HAYES (6), KEMBRICK MCCLENDON (7), KEMAREON BRYANT (8). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/9/2025. (ksl)ORDER granting 46 Motion to Declare Case Complex as to DE'ANDRE KENTERRIOUS LAMARION MCCLARIN (1), DANMON JERONE WILKERSON (2), ANGELA COOKLEY (3), JAYLEN FILMORE (4), JERRY HAYES (5), JELAN HAYES (6), KEMBRICK MCCLENDON (7), KEMAREON BRYANT (8). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/9/2025. (ksl)ORDER granting 46 Motion to Declare Case Complex as to DE'ANDRE KENTERRIOUS LAMARION MCCLARIN (1), DANMON JERONE WILKERSON (2), ANGELA COOKLEY (3), JAYLEN FILMORE (4), JERRY HAYES (5), JELAN HAYES (6), KEMBRICK MCCLENDON (7), KEMAREON BRYANT (8). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/9/2025. (ksl)ORDER granting 46 Motion to Declare Case Complex as to DE'ANDRE KENTERRIOUS LAMARION MCCLARIN (1), DANMON JERONE WILKERSON (2), ANGELA COOKLEY (3), JAYLEN FILMORE (4), JERRY HAYES (5), JELAN HAYES (6), KEMBRICK MCCLENDON (7), KEMAREON BRYANT (8). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/9/2025. (ksl)ORDER granting 46 Motion to Declare Case Complex as to DE'ANDRE KENTERRIOUS LAMARION MCCLARIN (1), DANMON JERONE WILKERSON (2), ANGELA COOKLEY (3), JAYLEN FILMORE (4), JERRY HAYES (5), JELAN HAYES (6), KEMBRICK MCCLENDON (7), KEMAREON BRYANT (8). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/9/2025. (ksl)ORDER granting 46 Motion to Declare Case Complex as to DE'ANDRE KENTERRIOUS LAMARION MCCLARIN (1), DANMON JERONE WILKERSON (2), ANGELA COOKLEY (3), JAYLEN FILMORE (4), JERRY HAYES (5), JELAN HAYES (6), KEMBRICK MCCLENDON (7), KEMAREON BRYANT (8). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/9/2025. (ksl)ORDER granting 46 Motion to Declare Case Complex as to DE'ANDRE KENTERRIOUS LAMARION MCCLARIN (1), DANMON JERONE WILKERSON (2), ANGELA COOKLEY (3), JAYLEN FILMORE (4), JERRY HAYES (5), JELAN HAYES (6), KEMBRICK MCCLENDON (7), KEMAREON BRYANT (8). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/9/2025. (ksl)ORDER granting 46 Motion to Declare Case Complex as to DE'ANDRE KENTERRIOUS LAMARION MCCLARIN (1), DANMON JERONE WILKERSON (2), ANGELA COOKLEY (3), JAYLEN FILMORE (4), JERRY HAYES (5), JELAN HAYES (6), KEMBRICK MCCLENDON (7), KEMAREON BRYANT (8). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/9/2025. (ksl)

Docket last updated: 12/09/2024 3:44 AM EST
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to DE'ANDRE KENTERRIOUS LAMARION MCCLARIN (1) count(s) 1, 2, DANMON JERONE WILKERSON (2) count(s) 1, ANGELA COOKLEY (3) count(s) 1, JAYLEN FILMORE (4) count(s) 1, JERRY HAYES (5) count(s) 1, JELAN HAYES (6) count(s) 1, KEMBRICK MCCLENDON (7) count(s) 1, KEMAREON BRYANT (8) count(s) 1. (elp)
Related: [-]