New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Case #: 1:24-cv-09335
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause05:75(2) Contract - Reduction in Grade
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 4:53 AM EST
Defendant
Doe Beneficiaries 1-10
Defendant
Doe Corporations 1-10
Defendant
Don King Productions, Inc.
501 Fairway Drive
Deerfield Beach, FL 33441
Defendant
Don King
Plaintiff
BYD Management, LLC
Represented By
Anthony Jabreel Murphy Jones, Sr
The Jones Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BYD Sports LLC
Represented By
Anthony Jabreel Murphy Jones, Sr
The Jones Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
45 45 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 05/16 11:53 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:42 MOTION to Dismiss AND/OR TRANSFER VENUE . . Document filed by Don King Productions, Inc., Don King..(Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
44 44 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/02 10:39 PM
FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:42 MOTION to Dismiss AND/OR TRANSFER VENUE . . Document filed by BYD Management, LLC, BYD Sports LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
43 43 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 04/11 6:24 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:42 MOTION to Dismiss AND/OR TRANSFER VENUE . . Document filed by Don King Productions, Inc., Don King..(Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
42 42 motion Dismiss Fri 04/11 6:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss AND/OR TRANSFER VENUE . Document filed by Don King Productions, Inc., Don King. Responses due by 4/25/2025.(Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
41 41 order Case Management Plan Wed 03/26 4:05 PM
ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried by a jury. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is:4 to 5 days. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 7/3/2025. Fact Discovery due by 7/3/2025. Expert Discovery due by 8/8/2025. Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/26/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
40 40 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 03/25 5:09 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by BYD Management, LLC, BYD Sports LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Letter Tue 03/25 5:07 PM
SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from BYD Management, LLC and BYD Sports, LLC dated 3/25/2025 re: Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by BYD Management, LLC, BYD Sports LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
38 38 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/18 3:44 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:37 Letter filed by BYD Management, LLC, BYD Sports LLC ENDORSEMENT By March 25, 2025, the parties shall submit a proposed case management plan that incorporates the following deadlines: 1. Initial requests and interrogatories: May 16, 2025 2. Depositions and fact discovery: July 3, 2025 3. Expert discovery: August 8, 2025 The proposed case management plan shall be accompanied by a letter as described in paragraph 4 of the Court's initial pretrial scheduling order, ECF No. 18. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 7/3/2025., Expert Discovery due by 8/8/2025., Fact Discovery due by 7/3/2025.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/18/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
37 37 misc Letter Mon 03/17 11:55 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Plaintiffs BYD Management, LLC and BYD Sports, LLC dated 3/17/2025 re: Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by BYD Management, LLC, BYD Sports LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Tue 03/11 3:56 PM
ORDER granting34 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendants' request to file a motion to dismiss or transfer this action is GRANTED. Accordingly: 1. By April 11, 2025, Defendants shall file their motion; 2. By May 2, 2025, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition papers; and 3. By May 16, 2025, Defendants shall file their reply, if any. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 34. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/11/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Letter Tue 03/11 11:22 AM
SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Plaintiffs BYD Management, LLC and BYD Sports, LLC dated 3/11/2025 re: Opposition to Defendants March 7, 2025, letter motion seeking leave to file a motion to dismiss or transfer venue.. Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/11 3:57 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/11/2025. Responses due by 5/2/2025 Replies due by 5/16/2025. (vfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
34 34 motion Leave to File Document Fri 03/07 5:15 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alejandro Brito dated March 7, 2025. Document filed by Don King Productions, Inc., Don King..(Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/06 12:28 PM
ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' letters dated March 3 and 4, 2025, which purport to respond to a pre-motion letter Plaintiffs received from Defendants on February 28. ECF Nos. 32, 32-1. Rules III.A-B of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases specify that, in the case of a motion to dismiss, the patties shall exchange two sets of pre-motion letters, the first set of which shall not be submitted to the Court. If, after that first exchange of letters, Defendants still wish to file a motion to dismiss, they shall file a pre-motion letter with the Court; only then may Plaintiffs file a response in opposition. Accordingly, the Court will disregard Plaintiffs' letters at ECF Nos. 32 and 32-1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/6/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
32 32 misc Letter Tue 03/04 11:28 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Anthony J.M. Jones, Esq. dated 3/4/2025 re: Response to Pre-Motion Letter to Dismiss for Improper Venue and 12(b)(6). Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit Letter to Defendants Counsel and ECF Cover Letter submitted by Plaintiffs BYD Management, LLC and BYD Sports, LLC pursuant to Rule III(A) of Judge Torres Individual Practices in response to Defendants Pre-Motion Letter dated February 28, 2025. Plaintiffs respectfully oppose Defendants request for leave to file a motion to dismiss or transfer and request that Defendants be directed to file their Answer within seven (7) days. Attachments: Exhibit A - Letter to Defendants Counsel dated March 3, 2025.
Friday, February 21, 2025
31 31 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/21 10:09 PM
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending19 Amended Complaint, against Doe Beneficiaries 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Don King Productions, Inc., Don King with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC. Related document:19 Amended Complaint,..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Exhibit M - Amazon24H Cancel
Friday, February 07, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Order on Motion to Preclude Fri 02/07 2:15 PM
ORDER granting26 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; terminating27 Motion to Preclude. Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiffs' request to amend their complaint to "provide further clarification regarding the contractual basis for venue in this Court, as well as additional allegations demonstrating Defendants' contacts with this forum." ECF No. 27 at 3. By February 21, 2025, Plaintiffs shall file their third amended complaint. Plaintiffs are reminded that any relevant exhibits must be attached to the amended, operative complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 26-27. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/7/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Fri 02/07 11:50 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 29 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/07 2:16 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2025. (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
29 29 misc Proposed Order Thu 02/06 5:53 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Proposed Order Thu 02/06 1:52 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 2/6/2025 (km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Pre-Motion Request to Dismiss
27 27 motion Preclude Thu 02/06 11:43 AM
FIRST MOTION to Preclude Defendants' Seek of Leave to File Motion to Dismiss . Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Order Thu 02/06 3:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Anthony Jones to RE-FILE Document No. 28 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The documents need to be filed separately. Re-file the Order using the event type Proposed Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. The letter is filed using Other Filings, Other, Documents Letter. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
26 26 motion Leave to File Document Wed 02/05 4:24 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alejandro Brito, Esq. dated 02.05.2025. Document filed by Don King Productions, Inc., Don King..(Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/29 9:59 AM
ORDER granting23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/28/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/28 9:29 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Alejandro Brito to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ld)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 01/29 10:00 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Don King Productions, Inc. answer due 2/7/2025; Don King answer due 2/7/2025. (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 01/27 6:45 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to19 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alejandro Brito dated January 27, 2025. Document filed by Don King Productions, Inc., Don King..(Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Proposed Order Mon 01/27 2:19 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Don King Productions, Inc., Don King. Related Document Number:21 ..(Brito, Alejandro) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 1/27/2025 (bc)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/27 10:09 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Don King Productions, Inc., Don King..(Brito, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 01/27 1:16 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
20 20 2 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/23 12:17 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Alejandro Brito to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30504557. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Don King Productions, Inc., Don King..(Brito, Alejandro) Modified on 1/23/2025 (rju)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Affidavit Affidavit of Alejandro Brito,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/23 12:41 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 20 MOTION for Alejandro Brito to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30504557. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (rju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 01/21 1:22 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anthony Jabreel Murphy Jones. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DOE BENEFICIARIES 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/17 5:18 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending15 Amended Complaint, against DOE BENEFICIARIES 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Don King Productions, Inc., Don King with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC. Related document:15 Amended Complaint,..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/17 11:49 AM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by March 17, 2025, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/17/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs order Order Fri 01/17 11:23 AM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by March 17, 2025, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, as further set forth herein. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by March 17, 2025, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/17/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/17 11:19 AM
ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/17/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 01/17 2:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Anthony Jabreel Murphy Jones to RE-FILE Document No. 15 Third Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF is titled incorrectly; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the pleading was not linked to the corresponding pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Second Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/16 7:54 PM
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against DOE BENEFICIARIES 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Don King Productions, Inc., Don King with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC. Related document:1 Complaint..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
14 14 1 pgs service Acknowledgment of Service Complaints Fri 01/10 4:44 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Don King Productions, Inc. served on 1/6/2025, answer due 1/27/2025. Service was accepted by Donna Moch, SOP Section Head. Document filed by BYD Sports LLC; BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/02 2:46 PM
ORDER Plaintiffs, two limited liability companies, filed this action invoking diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a). ECF No. 1 at 4. A limited liability company takes the citizenship of each of its members. See Bayerische Landesbank, NY Branch v. Aladdin Cap. Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012). In their complaint, Plaintiffs allege only that they are limited liability companies registered in Virginia. ECF No. 1 at 4. By order dated December 16, 2024, the Court directed Plaintiffs to amend their complaint to allege the citizenship of each of their members by December 31, 2024. ECF No. 5. On December 18, 2024, Plaintiffs filed an amended complaint. ECF No. 6.The amended complaint, which is dated December 12, 2024, again fails to list the citizenship of each of Plaintiffs' members. Accordingly, by January 17, 2025, Plaintiffs shall amend their complaint to allege the citizenship of each of their members. Plaintiffs are advised that failure to allege complete diversity or to comply with the Court's orders may result in dismissal. ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2025.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/2/2025) (jjc) Modified on 1/2/2025 (jjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
12 12 service Summons Issued Thu 12/19 2:47 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Don King..(jgo)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Thu 12/19 2:46 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Don King Productions, Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/19 2:49 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Anthony Jabreel Murphy Jones, Sr to RE-FILE Document No. 9 Request for Issuance of Summons, 10 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B) : a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/18 2:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DOE BENEFICIARIES 1-10, re:6 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/18 2:05 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10, re:6 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/18 2:03 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DON KING, re:6 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/18 1:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DON KING PRODUCTIONS, INC, re:6 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
6 6 21 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/18 11:47 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against DOE BENEFICIARIES 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Don King Productions, Inc., Don King with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC. Related document:1 Complaint..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit Ex -A - BYD with Don King Productions signed agreement,
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit Ex - B- DK coin giving to BYD,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit Ex - C - BYD Proposal,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit Ex - D - Video Screenshot DK and BYD,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit Ex - E - DK requests Sponsorship Help from BYD,
Att: 6 8 pgs Exhibit Ex - F- Ltr African Countries,
Att: 7 10 pgs Exhibit Ex - G - BYD w GEF MOU,
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit Ex - H- Ondo invites DK thru BYD,
Att: 9 4 pgs Exhibit Ex - I - Rumble TM,
Att: 10 1 pgs Exhibit Ex - J - BYD Nigerian License,
Att: 11 2 pgs Exhibit Ex - K - DK Cease and Desist,
Att: 12 9 pgs Exhibit Ex - L1 - GEF cancels bc of DK
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 12/17 12:42 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Anthony Jones to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the attorney information on the form used for the summons is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gpe)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/16 3:20 PM
ORDER Plaintiffs, two limited liability companies, bring this action invoking diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a). ECF No. 1 at 4. A limited liability company takes the citizenship of each of its members. See Bayerische Landesbank, NY Branch v. Aladdin Cap. Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012). fu their complaint, Plaintiffs allege only that they are limited liability companies registered in Virginia. ECF No. 1 at 4. Accordingly, by December 31, 2024, Plaintiffs shall amend their complaint to allege the citizenship of each of their members. If Plaintiffs fail to allege complete diversity, their complaint shall be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/16/2024) (ar)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
4 4 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 12/13 3:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DON KING PRODUCTIONS, INC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/13 3:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/13 3:05 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/13 9:56 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Anthony Jabreel Murphy Jones, Sr. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 12/13 9:58 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Anthony Jabreel Murphy Jones, Sr re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF (MISSING PARTIES). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 12/13 10:15 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 12/13 10:15 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 12/13 10:16 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Fri 12/13 12:39 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners BYD Sports LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10, DOE BENEFICIARIES 1-10 added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint.Document filed by BYD Sports LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10, DOE BENEFICIARIES 1-10. Related document:1 Complaint..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/12 11:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Don King Productions, Inc., Don King. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30325768)Document filed by BYD Management, LLC..(Jones, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading Mon 12/09 10:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Anthony Jabreel Murphy Jones, Sr to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 12/16/2024. (gp)
Related: [-]