Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10870

Georgia Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert M Matson
Case #: 1:24-ap-01006
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Melissa O. Mirick
1217 Pine Park Road
Cairo, GA 39828
Represented By
Melissa O. Mirick
contact info
Defendant
Zane R. Mirick, Jr.
1217 Pine Park Road
Cairo, GA 39828
Represented By
Zane R. Mirick, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
John William Bass, Jr
South Georgia Law Associates 126 North Broad Street PO Box 3379
Thomasville, GA 31799
Represented By
John William Bass, Jr.
South Georgia Law Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Sunday, April 06, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/07 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/04 9:12 AM
Scheduling Order re: Adversary case 24-01006 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by John William Bass Jr against Melissa O. Mirick, Zane R. Mirick Jr.. Fee Amount $350 Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint. Discovery due by 10/1/2025, Motions for Summary Judgment due by 12/1/2025, Joint Pre Trial Stipulation due by 11/17/2025. (Bass, D.
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 audio audio Tue 04/01 4:03 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/1/2025 2:49:58 PM ]. File Size [ 2620 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:55 ]. (CourtSpeak)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Tue 04/01 7:39 PM
Hearing Held - JUDGE TO ENTER A SIX MONTH DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER Related [+]. Order/Withdrawal Follow-up Due: 4/22/2025. (Harris, Denise)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John William Bass, Hearing Set on Complaint
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 10:35 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Melissa O. Mirick, Zane R. Mirick Jr. (Terry, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
10 10 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons Fri 01/03 3:56 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons. Served on Zane R. Mirick Jr. 1/3/2025 (Warren, Ronald) Modified on 1/6/2025 Duplicate of 8 (Bass, D.)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons Fri 01/03 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons. Served on Melissa O. Mirick 1/3/2025 (Warren, Ronald) Modified on 1/6/2025 Duplicate of 7 (Bass, D.)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons Fri 01/03 3:47 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons. Served on Zane R. Mirick, Jr. on 1/3/2025 (Warren, Ronald). Related document(s)4 Summons Issued. Modified on 1/6/2025 to show service on correct party (Bass, D.)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons Fri 01/03 3:46 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons. Served on Melissa O. Mirick on 1/3/2025 Related [+] (Warren, Ronald). Modified on 1/6/2025 - to correct linkage (Bass, D.)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 01/03 3:42 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ronald B. Warren filed by Plaintiff John William Bass Jr (Warren, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
5 5 court Summons Issued Fri 12/27 4:55 PM
Summons issued on Melissa O. Mirick Date Issued 12/27/2024, Answer Due 1/27/2025. Certificate of Service of Summons due no later than: 1/3/2025. (Gordon, LaSonja)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 12/27 4:52 PM
Summons issued on Zane R. Mirick Jr. Date Issued 12/27/2024, Answer Due 1/27/2025. Certificate of Service of Summons due no later than: 1/3/2025. (Gordon, LaSonja)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set on Complaint Fri 12/27 4:56 PM
Adversary case 24-01006 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by John William Bass Jr against Melissa O. Mirick, Zane R. Mirick Jr.. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/1/2025 at 02:00 PM Telephonically (Gordon, LaSonja)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John William Bass
Thursday, December 26, 2024
3 3 misc Request to Clerk to Issue Summons Thu 12/26 3:48 PM
Request to Clerk to Issue Summons. Pre trial conference to be held on 04/01/2025, time: 2:00 P.M., location: Macon Courtroom A, Defendant: Melissa O. Mirick Zane R. Mirick Jr. filed by Plaintiff John William Bass Jr (Bass, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
2 2 utility Memo Thu 12/12 3:23 PM
Memo to Atty Bass RE: REquest to Clerk to Issue Summons Related [+]. Memo followup due on 1/10/2025. (Bass, D.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John William Bass
Friday, December 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 4:41 PM
Adversary case 24-01006 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by John William Bass Jr against Melissa O. Mirick, Zane R. Mirick Jr.. Fee Amount $350 (Bass, John)
Related: [-]