Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10870

Georgia Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert M Matson
Case #: 1:24-ap-01007
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Melissa O. Mirick
1217 Pine Park Road
Cairo, GA 39828
Represented By
Melissa O. Mirick
contact info
Defendant
Zane R. Mirick, Jr.
1217 Pine Park Road
Cairo, GA 39828
Represented By
Zane R. Mirick, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
South Georgia Law Associates, LLC
126 N Broad St
Thomasville, GA 31792
Represented By
John William Bass, Jr.
South Georgia Law Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Sunday, April 06, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/07 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Scheduling Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/04 9:15 AM
Scheduling Order re: Adversary case 24-01007 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by South Georgia Law Associates, LLC against Melissa O. Mirick, Zane R. Mirick Jr.. Fee Amount $350 Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint. Discovery due by 10/1/2025, Motions for Summary Judgment due by 12/1/2025, Joint Pre Trial Stipulation due by 11/17/2025. (Bass, D.
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
utility Remark (Public) Wed 04/02 8:09 AM
Special Note from the Court: . See Adversary 24-1006 for audio of hearing held 4/1/25 (Heyward, L)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
court Hearing Held Tue 04/01 7:40 PM
Hearing Held JUDGE TO ENTER A SIX MONTH DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER Related [+]. Order/Withdrawal Follow-up Due: 4/22/2025. (Harris, Denise)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff South Georgia Law Associates, LLC, Hearing Set on Complaint
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 11:21 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Melissa O. Mirick, Zane R. Mirick Jr. (Terry, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
8 8 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons Fri 01/03 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons. Served on Zane R. Mirick Jr. 1/3/2025 (Warren, Ronald). Related document(s)4 Summons Issued. Modified on 1/6/2025 - to add linkage to correct event(Bass, D.)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons Fri 01/03 3:54 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons. Served on Melissa O. Mirick 1/3/2025 Related [+] (Warren, Ronald). Modified on 1/6/2025 to remove incorrect linkage (Bass, D.)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 01/03 3:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ronald B. Warren filed by Plaintiff South Georgia Law Associates, LLC (Warren, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
5 5 court Summons Issued Fri 12/27 5:09 PM
Summons issued on Melissa O. Mirick Date Issued 12/27/2024, Answer Due 1/27/2025. Certificate of Service of Summons due no later than: 1/3/2025. (Gordon, LaSonja)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 12/27 5:08 PM
Summons issued on Zane R. Mirick Jr. Date Issued 12/27/2024, Answer Due 1/27/2025. Certificate of Service of Summons due no later than: 1/3/2025. (Gordon, LaSonja)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set on Complaint Fri 12/27 5:10 PM
Adversary case 24-01007 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by South Georgia Law Associates, LLC against Melissa O. Mirick, Zane R. Mirick Jr.. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/1/2025 at 02:00 PM Telephonically. (Gordon, LaSonja)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff South Georgia Law Associates, LLC
Thursday, December 26, 2024
3 3 misc Request to Clerk to Issue Summons Thu 12/26 3:49 PM
Request to Clerk to Issue Summons. Pre trial conference to be held on 04/01/2025, time: 2:00 P.M., location: Macon Courtroom A, Defendant: Melissa O. Mirick Zane R. Mirick Jr. filed by Plaintiff South Georgia Law Associates, LLC (Bass, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
2 2 utility Memo Thu 12/12 3:27 PM
Memo to Atty Bass RE: Request to Clerk to Issue Summons Related [+]. Memo followup due on 1/10/2025. (Bass, D.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff South Georgia Law Associates, LLC
Friday, December 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/06 4:45 PM
Adversary case 24-01007 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by South Georgia Law Associates, LLC against Melissa O. Mirick, Zane R. Mirick Jr.. Fee Amount $350 (Bass, John)
Related: [-]