California Southern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Battaglia
Referred: Michelle M Pettit
Case #: 3:24-cv-02286
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332bw Diversity -Breach of Warranty
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 12:42 AM PST
Defendant
American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By
Fred J. Fresard
Klein Thomas Lee & Fresard
contact info
Ian Kennedy Edwards
Klein Thomas Lee & Fresard
contact info
Kristyn Wong
Klein Thomas & Lee
contact info
Defendant
Honda Motor Company Limited
Plaintiff
Chris Bissell
Represented By
Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Beasley Allen Et Al
contact info
James Mitchell Williams
Beasley Allen Et Al
contact info
Paula R. Brown
Blood Hurst & O'Reardon, LLP
contact info
Timothy G. Blood
Blood Hurst & O'Reardon, LLP
contact info
Henry Clay Barnett, III
Beasley Allen Et Al
contact info
Adam Bucci
Blood Hurst & O'Reardon LLP
contact info
Thomas Joseph O'Reardon, II
Blood Hurst & O'Reardon, LLP
contact info
Trenton H. Mann, I
Beasley Allen Et Al
contact info
Dylan Thomas Martin
Beasley Allen Et Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/24 2:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Wong, Kristyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/17 4:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Chris Bissell, Lisa Kiedrowski, Cindy Massey, James Orton, Chris Vucovich. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
25 25 order Order Setting Briefing Schedule Thu 04/03 2:17 PM
ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint: Responses due by 4/17/2025; Replies due by 4/24/2025; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2025 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (Jaski, K.)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 04/03 12:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc..(Wong, Kristyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 43 pgs Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - 2018 Honda Warranty Basebook AWL05251,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - 2020 Honda Warranty Basebook Rev02
Monday, March 03, 2025
23 23 137 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/03 1:54 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Class Action Complaint against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Motor Company Limited, filed by Chris Bissell, Cindy Massey, James Orton, Lisa Kiedrowski, Chris Vucovich. (Blood, Timothy) (maq)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Ex. A,
Att: 2 Ex. B,
Att: 3 Ex. C,
Att: 4 Ex. D,
Att: 5 Ex. E,
Att: 6 Ex. F,
Att: 7 Ex. G,
Att: 8 Ex. H,
Att: 9 Ex. I,
Att: 10 Ex. J,
Att: 11 Ex. K
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 01/22 3:50 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Brandon Lee Boxler, re21 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/22/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
21 21 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/21 5:52 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19526191.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Boxler, Brandon) (exs)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 01/17 3:08 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Fred Fresard, re14 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/17/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 01/17 3:02 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ian Edwards, re15 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/17/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Fri 01/17 12:51 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Trenton H. Mann, I appearing for Plaintiff Chris Bissell (no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Fri 01/17 12:48 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Wilson Daniel Miles, III appearing for Plaintiff Chris Bissell (no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Kristyn Wong on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Wong, Kristyn)Attorney Kristyn Wong added to party American Honda Motor Co., Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/17 10:11 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19517749.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Edwards, Ian) (exs)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/17 10:07 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19517738.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Fresard, Fred) (exs)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/17 9:48 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19517604.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Mann, Trenton) (exs)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/17 9:11 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19517248.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Miles, Wilson) (exs)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Fri 01/17 8:57 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Dylan Thomas Martin appearing for Plaintiff Chris Bissell (no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/17 8:47 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19517019.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Martin, Dylan) (exs)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Fri 01/17 8:41 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: James Mitchell Williams appearing for Plaintiff Chris Bissell (no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/17 8:33 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19516902.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Williams, James) (exs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
7 7 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Thu 01/16 2:12 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Henry Clay Barnett, III appearing for Plaintiff Chris Bissell (no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 01/16 2:04 PM
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Joint Motion Regarding Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, Briefing Schedule, and Enlargement of Page Limits (Doc. No.4 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/16/2025. (maq)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/16 1:34 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19514907.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Barnett, Henry) (exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 01/15 1:00 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule by Chris Bissell. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/07 4:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Bissell. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. served. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 12/09 11:10 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
1 1 80 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Motor Company Limited ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19412121.), filed by Chris Bissell. The new case number is 3:24-cv-2286-AJB-MMP. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit are assigned to the case. (Blood, Timothy)(ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Ex. A,
Att: 3 Ex. B,
Att: 4 Ex. C,
Att: 5 Ex. D,
Att: 6 Ex. E,
Att: 7 Ex. F,
Att: 8 Ex. G,
Att: 9 Ex. H