California Central District Court
Judge:Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-10568
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 2:29 AM PST
Defendant
Rosemary Langley Melville
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
Edwin Ernesto Aragon Lizarraga
Represented By
Marc A. Karlin
Karlin And Karlin Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 23, 2025
7 7 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 01/23 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Edwin Ernesto Aragon Lizarraga. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Karlin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 12/17 9:42 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Rosemary Langley Melville, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 12/13 12:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Edwin Ernesto Aragon Lizarraga. (Karlin, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Tue 12/10 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 12/09 10:53 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Edwin Ernesto Aragon Lizarraga, (Karlin, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 12/09 10:52 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Edwin Ernesto Aragon Lizarraga. (Karlin, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/09 10:51 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38717094 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Edwin Ernesto Aragon Lizarraga. (Attorney Marc A. Karlin added to party Edwin Ernesto Aragon Lizarraga(pty:pla))(Karlin, Marc)
Related: [-]