Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:24-cv-00518
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1836 Civil Proceedings to Enjoin Violations
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 5:25 AM EST
Defendant
Michael Boland
1321 Rolling Ridge Lane
Sturgis, MI 49091
Represented By
Tracey Lynn Steele Schafer
Anderson Agostino & Keller PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Zurcher Tire, Inc.
Zurcher Tire, Inc. 101 N. Polk St.
Monroe, IN 46772
Represented By
Jason T Clagg
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Cody D Woods
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
17 17 motion Settlement Mon 05/05 10:38 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement (Entry of Agreed Injunction) by Plaintiff Zurcher Tire, Inc..(Clagg, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Injunction
Monday, April 14, 2025
16 16 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/14 2:09 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins:15 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadline to Seek Leave of Court to File Amended Pleadings is granted. The deadline for Pla and Dft to seek leave of Court to file an amended pleading is 4/27/2025. Text entry order. (mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/28 3:40 PM
MOTION to extend deadline to seek leave of Court to file amended pleadings by Plaintiff Zurcher Tire, Inc.. (Woods, Cody)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/20 2:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 2/21/2025. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 11/30/2025. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 6/30/2025; and from Defendant by 7/31/2025. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 3/28/2025; as to Defendant is 3/28/2025. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 2/2/2026. The parties have agreed upon Anthony Stites as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/20/2025. (ash)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Thu 02/20 11:09 AM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/20/2025 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Jason Clagg. Dft appeared by atty Tracey Lynn Steele Schafer. The12 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as mediator. Atty Clagg to notify mediator by letter, copy to atty Schafer. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/13/2025. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 02/17 10:06 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clagg, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
11 11 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Mon 02/03 3:14 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Mon 02/03 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2025 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/17 2:33 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Michael Boland.(Schafer, Tracey)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Lynn Steele Schafer on behalf of Michael Boland (Schafer, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/27 12:46 PM
Dft Michael Boland answer due 1/6/2025 per7 Acknowledgement of Service. (sej)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
7 7 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 12/20 2:13 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to4 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Zurcher Tire, Inc..(Woods, Cody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service
Friday, December 13, 2024
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/13 10:50 AM
***Corporate Disclosure Deadline terminated. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/11 4:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurcher Tire, Inc.. (Woods, Cody)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 12/11 10:40 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Plaintiff is ordered to file a corporate disclosure statement in compliance with FRCP 7.1 and General Order 2023-06 by 12/18/2024. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 12/10 8:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Michael Boland. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kmt)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/10 8:18 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/09 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cody D Woods on behalf of Zurcher Tire, Inc. (Woods, Cody)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/09 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T Clagg on behalf of Zurcher Tire, Inc. (Clagg, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 1:03 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Michael Boland ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5760008.), filed by Zurcher Tire, Inc..(Clagg, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons 1 - Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet 2 - Civil Cover Sheet