Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Referred: Ryan C Carson
Case #: 4:24-cv-03225
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 3:52 AM CST
Defendant
Liberty First Credit Union
501 N 46th Street
Lincoln, NE 68503
Represented By
Alexander D. Boyd
Polsinelli Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Denise Walker
Represented By
Mark K. Svensson
Levi, Korsinsky, Llp Law Firm - New York
contact info
Eduard Korsinsky
Levi, Korsinsky, Llp Law Firm - New York
contact info
Mark Svensson
Levi, Korsinsky, Llp Law Firm - New York
contact info
Brian E. Jorde
Domina Law Group
contact info

GPO Jan 08 2025
ules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in Eduard Korsinsky being removed as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (LRM)ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE On or before January 24, 2025, Eduard Korsinsky must either comply with the requests set forth in the letters from the Clerk of the Court or show cause by written affidavit why compliance is not possible as required under the r

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
27 27 motion Dismiss Wed 05/14 3:04 PM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Attorney Brian E. Jorde on behalf of Plaintiff Denise Walker.(Jorde, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
26 26 order Settlement Order Tue 04/15 9:16 AM
ORDER - The Motion to Compel Arbitration or in the Alternative to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint under Rules 12(b)(1) or 12(b)(6) is denied as moot. (Filing No.16 ). On or before 5/14/2025 , the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) that will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/11 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Attorney Mark K. Svensson on behalf of Plaintiff Denise Walker (Svensson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion to Extend Mon 03/31 11:32 AM
TEXT ORDER granting23 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have until April 14, 2025 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration. No further continuances will be granted absent a showing of exceptional good cause. Any reply shall be filed in accordance with the local rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (KNH)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extend Mon 03/31 8:31 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Mark K. Svensson on behalf of Plaintiff Denise Walker.(Svensson, Mark) Modified to Motion to Extend on 3/31/2025 (KNH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion to Extend Wed 03/12 1:44 PM
TEXT ORDER granting21 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have until March 31, 2025 to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Compel. Any reply shall be filed in accordance with the local rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (KNH)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Extend Wed 03/12 1:12 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Brian E. Jorde on behalf of Plaintiff Denise Walker.(Jorde, Brian) Modified to Motion to Extend on 3/12/2025 (KNH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
20 20 order Order on Motion to Extend Wed 02/12 9:03 AM
TEXT ORDER granting19 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have until March 17, 2025 to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1) or 12(b)(6). Any reply shall be filed in accordance with the local rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (KNH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
19 19 motion Extend Tue 02/11 1:04 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend time to Respond to MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint under Rules 12(b)(1) or 12(b)(6) 16 by Attorney Brian E. Jorde on behalf of Plaintiff Denise Walker.(Jorde, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
18 18 oth_doc Index Fri 01/31 2:47 PM
INDEX in support of Brief,17 , MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint under Rules 12(b)(1) or 12(b)(6) 16 by Attorney Alexander D. Boyd on behalf of Defendant Liberty First Credit Union.(Boyd, Alexander)
Related: [-]
17 17 oth_doc Brief Fri 01/31 2:38 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint under Rules 12(b)(1) or 12(b)(6) 16 by Attorney Alexander D. Boyd on behalf of Defendant Liberty First Credit Union.(Boyd, Alexander)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Compel Fri 01/31 2:18 PM
MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint under Rules 12(b)(1) or 12(b)(6) by Attorney Alexander D. Boyd on behalf of Defendant Liberty First Credit Union.(Boyd, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
15 15 order Order - Text Only Tue 01/28 2:26 PM
TEXT ORDER - Eduard Korinsky failed to comply with the Court's order to show cause (Filing No.13 ) and is hereby terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (KNH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
14 14 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Tue 01/14 12:54 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Alexander D. Boyd on behalf of Defendant Liberty First Credit Union.(Boyd, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause - Attorney Deadline Wed 01/08 12:15 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE On or before January 24, 2025, Eduard Korsinsky must either comply with the requests set forth in the letters from the Clerk of the Court or show cause by written affidavit why compliance is not possible as required under the rules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in Eduard Korsinsky being removed as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
12 12 notice Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/30 8:59 AM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Liberty First Credit Union. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Thu 12/26 9:19 AM
TEXT ORDER granting10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have until January 31, 2025 to file an answer or other responsive pleading as to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (KNH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Tue 12/24 12:36 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Attorney Alexander D. Boyd on behalf of Defendant Liberty First Credit Union.(Boyd, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/16 4:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Liberty First Credit Union on 12/10/2024. (Svensson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/11 9:56 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice7 for attorney Mark K. Svensson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/11 9:27 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5215272 by Attorney Mark K. Svensson on behalf of Plaintiff Denise Walker.(Svensson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
6 6 oth_evt Attorney Letter Mon 12/09 12:24 PM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Mark Svensson has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_evt Attorney Letter Mon 12/09 12:23 PM
ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Eduard Korsinsky has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 12/09 12:20 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Liberty First Credit Union. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Mon 12/09 12:17 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Requested Mon 12/09 11:26 AM
Summons Requested as to Liberty First Credit Union regarding Complaint1 . (Jorde, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Liberty First Credit Union ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5213449), by Attorney Brian E. Jorde on behalf of Denise Walker(Jorde, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1