Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:24-cv-02273
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Case in other court:Clark County, NV, A-24-905447-B
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 3:03 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Data Physics Corporation
Represented By
Joseph P Garin
Lipson Neilson P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Noise & Vibration Technologies, LLC
Represented By
Joseph P Garin
Lipson Neilson P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Vadatech, Inc.
Represented By
John Benedict
Law Offices Of John Benedict
contact info
Defendant
Data Physics Corporation
Represented By
Joseph P Garin
Lipson Neilson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Noise & Vibration Technologies, LLC
Represented By
Joseph P Garin
Lipson Neilson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Vadatech, Inc.
Represented By
John Benedict
Law Offices Of John Benedict
contact info


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
19 19 10 pgs order Order on Stipulated Protective Order Thu 04/17 10:59 AM
ORDER Granting18 Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/16/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Stipulated Protective Order Wed 04/16 9:37 AM
Amended STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendants Data Physics Corporation, Noise & Vibration Technologies, LLC.(Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 31, 2025
17 17 notice Notice Other Mon 03/31 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Vadatech, Inc.. (Benedict, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
16 16 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Fri 03/21 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lisa J Zastrow on behalf of Defendants Data Physics Corporation, Noise & Vibration Technologies, LLC. (Zastrow, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
15 15 notice Notice Other Sun 03/02 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Data Physics Corporation, Noise & Vibration Technologies, LLC. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
14 14 minord Minute Order Order on Stipulated Protective Order Fri 02/28 1:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/28/2025. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. Pending before the Court is the proposed Stipulated Protective Order (ECF No. 13 ). In paragraph 13 of the submission, the parties presume submission of confidential information may be filed under seal. However, the parties "may not simply rely on the Stipulated Protective Order to justify sealing documents filed in the record under seal." Heath v. Tristar Products, Inc. , Case No. 2:17-cv-02869-GMN-PAL, 2019 WL 12311995, at *1 (D. Nev. Apr. 17, 2019) citing Foltz v. State Farm Mut. Auto. Ins. Co. , 331 F.3d 1122, 1133 (9th Cir. 2003) Related [+]; Beckman Indus., Inc. v. Int'l Ins. Co. , 966 F.2d 470, 475-76 (9th Cir. 1992) (blanket stipulated protective orders are over inclusive by nature and do not include a finding of "good cause"). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulated Protective Order (ECF No. 13 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must submit a revised stipulated protective order that references Local Rule IA 10-5 and the proper procedures for seeking to seal documents which must be followed in this case. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
Related: [-] liance on a blanket protective order, without more, will not make a showing of good cause
Thursday, February 27, 2025
13 13 motion Stipulated Protective Order Thu 02/27 4:58 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendants Data Physics Corporation, Noise & Vibration Technologies, LLC.(Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, February 21, 2025
12 12 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 02/21 5:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting11 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 7/11/2025. Motions due by 8/11/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2025. NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/21/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 02/21 9:06 AM
Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Vadatech, Inc., Counter Defendant Vadatech, Inc.. (Benedict, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 02/03 6:51 PM
ANSWER to8 Answer to Petition for Removal,,, Counterclaim,, filed by Vadatech, Inc..(Benedict, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 01/16 3:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vadatech, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Benedict, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Counterclaim Mon 01/13 5:31 PM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/23/2025., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/27/2025.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants. filed by All Defendants.(Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
7 7 misc Status Report Tue 01/07 1:57 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT After Removal by Defendant Data Physics Corporation. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 misc Statement in Removal Case Thu 12/19 11:03 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Data Physics Corporation, Noise & Vibration Technologies, LLC. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 12/13 1:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Noise & Vibration Technologies, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Battery Ventures X LP, Other Affiliate Battery Ventures X Side Fund LP, Other Affiliate Battery Investment Partners X LLC for Noise & Vibration Technologies, LLC added. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 12/13 1:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Data Physics Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Data Physics Holding Corp. for Data Physics Corporation added. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
3 3 order Standing Order Wed 12/11 10:41 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
2 2 minord Minute Order Removal Case Mon 12/09 5:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 12/9/2024. By Deputy Clerk: RJDG. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/24/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/8/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Mon 12/09 11:50 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-24-905447-B, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7892019) by Data Physics Corporation, Noise & Vibration Technologies, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/19/2024. (Garin, Joseph) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-3,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-4,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-5,
Att: 6 Exhibit A-6,
Att: 7 Exhibit B,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Ex C
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 12/09 5:30 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RJDG)
Related: [-]