Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Karen Gren Scholer
Case #: 3:24-cv-03074
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 5:23 AM CST
Defendant
Oldcastle BE Inc
Plaintiff
Carol J Ohmann
Represented By
David Bell
Law Offices Of David Bell, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 04/24 2:32 PM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint,, filed by Oldcastle BE Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Pannell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/15 12:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Oldcastle BE Inc filed by Carol J Ohmann. Summons(es) not requested at this time. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bell, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
17 17 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/08 12:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 9/14/2026 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Motions due by 3/20/2026. Discovery due by 12/19/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2026 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/19/2025. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/8/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order For ADR Mon 04/07 4:13 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: The Court ORDERS this case to mediation before: Kathy Fragnoli.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Mediation shall be in person or by videoconference, as directed by the Mediator, and completed on or before 12/19/2025. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/7/2025) (twd)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Jury Demand Mon 04/07 12:37 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carol J Ohmann. (Bell, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 04/07 5:18 PM
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Scheduling Conference held on 4/4/2025. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Suzanne Anderson, David Bell; Defense - Kathryn Blakely. (Court Reporter: Tutti Bui) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :08. (tub)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order Fri 04/04 4:18 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: At the FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference, held on April 4, 2025, Plaintiff orally moved for leave to amend her Complaint, and the Court granted the Motion. Accordingly, Plaintiff may file an amended Complaint by April 18, 2025 . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/4/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/04 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathryn Bernadette Blakey on behalf of Oldcastle BE Inc. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Blakey, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/04 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron E Pannell on behalf of Oldcastle BE Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Pannell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
10 10 order Order Wed 04/02 1:19 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: **LOCATION CHANGE ONLY** The April 4, 2025 , Scheduling Conference at 2:00 p.m. will take place in Judge Kinkeade's courtroom on the 16th Floor. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/2/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Tue 03/11 3:39 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL HEARING: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2025 02:00 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/11/2025) (cfk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 02/24 4:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Oldcastle BE Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Edwards, Kelley)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/24 4:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Oldcastle BE Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Kelley Edwards added to party Oldcastle BE Inc(pty:dft) (Edwards, Kelley)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/21 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Bell for Suzanne M. Anderson on behalf of Carol J Ohmann. (Bell, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
5 5 misc Court Request For Recusal Tue 12/10 11:17 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:24-cv-3074-S. Related [+]
Related: [-] kc
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 12/10 10:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Oldcastle BE Inc. (cfk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 qcref Fish Tue 12/10 10:24 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 12/09 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carol J ohmann. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bell, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Oldcastle BuildingEnvelope Inc filed by Carol J ohmann. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number BTXNDC-15114431) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bell, David)
Related: [-]