Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: Ronald C Griffin
Case #: 7:24-cv-00326
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 4:41 AM CST
Defendant
John Doe #1
Defendant
John Doe #2
Defendant
Indiegogo, Inc.
Represented By
Paul R. Genender
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kickstarter, PBC
Represented By
Ethan J. Levinton
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Olivia A. Adendorff
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Jeremy A. Fielding
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Allison Worthy Buchner
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Launchboom, Inc.
Plaintiff
Coast Runner, Inc.
Represented By
Cody Christian Coll
Stone Hilton, PLLC
contact info
Christopher D. Hilton
Stone Hilton PLLC
contact info
Judd E Stone, II
Stone Hilton, PLLC
contact info
Ari Cuenin
Stone Hilton, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 05/05 11:35 AM
Text Order GRANTING43 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit. It is ORDERED that the page limit for Plaintiff's consolidated response to Defendant Indiegogo, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, ECF 34, Defendant Kickstarter, PBCs Motion to Dismiss, ECF 36, and Defendant Label Creative, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. is extended from 20 pages to 30 pages. It is further ORDERED that the page limit for the moving Defendants' reply briefs is extended from 10 pages to 15 pages. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's consolidated response, ECF 43-1. That response will be treated as if it were filed on May 2, 2025, for all purposes. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
43 43 motion Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Fri 05/02 11:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Coast Runner, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Response,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
42 42 respm Response to Motion Fri 05/02 11:37 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Coast Runner, Inc., re39 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Label Creative, LLC (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/16 10:42 AM
Text Order GRANTING41 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's responses to Defendant Indiegogo, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 34, Defendant Kickstarter, PBC's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 36, Defendant Label Creative, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 40, and Defendant Label Creative, LLC's Motion to Transfer, ECF No. 39, are due on May 2, 2025. Defendants shall file their replies in support of those motions not later than May 19, 2025. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
41 41 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/15 4:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim / Kickstarter's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) ,39 MOTION to Transfer Case ,34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ,40 MOTION to Dismiss by Coast Runner, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
40 40 motion Dismiss Fri 04/11 8:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Label Creative, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Wilkins, Milton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Label Creative LLC's Motion to Dismiss
39 39 motion Transfer Case Fri 04/11 8:19 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case by Label Creative, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Wilkins, Milton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix in Support of Defendant Label Creative LLC's Motion to Transfer,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Mark Pecota,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Accelerator Consulting Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Terms and Conditions and Privacy Policy,
Att: 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Label Creative LLC's Motion to Transfer
Thursday, April 10, 2025
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/10 11:07 AM
Text Order GRANTING37 Milton P. Wilkins' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Wilkins has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/09 11:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kickstarter, PBC, re19 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Kickstarter, PBC (Buchner, Allison)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 10:21 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ben Alexander Barnes on behalf of Milton P. Wilkins ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20019535) by on behalf of Label Creative, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Barnes, Ben)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/09 10:12 AM
Text Order MOOTING17 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint (Doc. 30), which moots Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. See, e.g., Griffin v. Am. Zurich Ins. Co., 697 F. App'x 793, 797 (5th Cir. 2017) (per curiam) ("Once filed, that amended complaint rendered all earlier motions, including [the plaintiff's] motion for partial summary judgment, moot.") (citing King v. Dogan, 31 F.3d 344, 346 (5th Cir. 1994)). It is so ORDERED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mflc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/09 10:15 AM
Text Order MOOTING18 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint (Doc. 30), which moots Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. See, e.g., Griffin v. Am. Zurich Ins. Co., 697 F. App'x 793, 797 (5th Cir. 2017) (per curiam) ("Once filed, that amended complaint rendered all earlier motions, including [the plaintiff's] motion for partial summary judgment, moot.") (citing King v. Dogan, 31 F.3d 344, 346 (5th Cir. 1994)). It is so ORDERED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mflc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
36 36 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 04/08 11:22 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim / Kickstarter's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Kickstarter, PBC.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Levinton, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
35 35 misc Proposed Order Tue 04/08 8:37 PM
Proposed Order to34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Indiegogo, Inc.. (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Dismiss Tue 04/08 6:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Indiegogo, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/04 3:56 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Indiegogo, Inc., re16 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay filed by Defendant Indiegogo, Inc. (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/02 9:25 AM
Text Order GRANTING32 Defendant Kickstarter, PBC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. It is ORDERED that Defendant Kickstarter, PBC's reply in support of its Motion to Transfer and/or Sever, ECF No. 19, is extended to April 9, 2025. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/01 11:18 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION to Transfer Case by Kickstarter, PBC.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Buchner, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 03/25 11:03 AM
Text Order GRANTING31 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File its First Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File its First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that leave is GRANTED and Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed March 21, 2025, (Doc. 30) is accepted. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
31 31 motion Leave to File Document Mon 03/24 8:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Coast Runner, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
notice Deficiency Notice Mon 03/24 3:02 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 30 Amended Complaint Order granting Leave by the Court is required. Please file a Motion for Leave to file an amended complaint. Please attach the proposed order to the motion. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/21 11:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Coast Runner, Inc..(Stone, Judd)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/21 11:25 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Coast Runner, Inc., re19 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Kickstarter, PBC (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/21 11:20 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Coast Runner, Inc., re16 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay filed by Defendant Indiegogo, Inc. (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/21 3:07 PM
ORDER GRANTING21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
26 26 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/18 4:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2027 01:30 PM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Jury Selection/Trial set for 4/5/2027 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 5/23/2025, Discovery due by 6/26/2026, Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2026. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
25 25 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 03/14 7:47 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Coast Runner, Inc.. (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Fri 03/14 7:45 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Coast Runner, Inc.. (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/14 11:53 AM
Text Order GRANTING23 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response is GRANTED. It ORDERED that Plaintiff's responses to Kickstarter, PBC's and Indiegogo, Inc.'s Motions to Transfer, ECF Nos. 16 and 19, are due on March 21, 2025. Kickstarter and Indiegogo shall file their replies in support of those motions not later than April 4, 2025. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/13 4:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION to Transfer Case ,16 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay by Coast Runner, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Hilton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 06, 2025
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 10:17 AM
Text Order GRANTING22 Samuel J. Thomas' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Thomas hasn't already done do, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 2:57 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul R. Genender on behalf of Samuel J. Thomas ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19872177) by on behalf of Indiegogo, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation Tue 03/04 1:32 PM
STIPULATION regarding Responsive Pleadings by Launchboom, Inc.. (Barnes, Ben)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/04 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ben Alexander Barnes on behalf of Launchboom, Inc.. Attorney Ben Alexander Barnes added to party Launchboom, Inc.(pty:dft) (Barnes, Ben)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/03 1:58 PM
Text Order GRANTING15 Ryan P. Phair's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Phair has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(F)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
19 19 motion Transfer Case Fri 02/28 11:49 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case by Kickstarter, PBC.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Levinton, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix in Support of Motion to Transfer,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
18 18 motion Dismiss Fri 02/28 11:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Kickstarter, PBC.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Levinton, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 motion Dismiss Fri 02/28 10:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Indiegogo, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 motion Sever Fri 02/28 10:00 PM
MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay by Indiegogo, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Danae Ringelmann,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Account Creation Page,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Launch Campaign Page,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Terms of Use,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/28 9:26 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul R. Genender on behalf of Ryan P. Phair ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19849166) by on behalf of Indiegogo, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
14 14 service Acknowledgment of Service Wed 02/26 1:46 PM
Acknowledgment of Service returned by Coast Runner, Inc.. Launchboom, Inc. served on 2/19/2025, answer due 3/21/2025. (Coll, Cody)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/16 9:47 AM
Text Order GRANTING12 Ethan J. Levinton's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Levinton has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 01/15 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul R. Genender on behalf of Indiegogo, Inc.. Attorney Paul R. Genender added to party Indiegogo, Inc.(pty:dft) (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/15 11:27 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy A. Fielding on behalf of Ethan J. Levinton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19670439) by on behalf of Kickstarter, PBC.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Fielding, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/15 10:28 AM
Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Buchner has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/14 3:03 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy A. Fielding on behalf of Allison W. Buchner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19666640) by on behalf of Kickstarter, PBC.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Fielding, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 01/14 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Olivia A. Adendorff on behalf of Kickstarter, PBC. Attorney Olivia A. Adendorff added to party Kickstarter, PBC(pty:dft) (Adendorff, Olivia)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 01/14 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy A. Fielding on behalf of Kickstarter, PBC. Attorney Jeremy A. Fielding added to party Kickstarter, PBC(pty:dft) (Fielding, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
8 8 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Fri 01/10 9:28 AM
Pro Hac Vice Letter to attorney Ryan Phair . (jb3) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/10/2025) (jb3)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Fri 01/10 9:26 AM
Pro Hac Vice Letter to attorney Allison W. Buchner . (jb3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 01/09 11:50 AM
STIPULATION Regarding Responsive Pleadings by Coast Runner, Inc.. (Stone, Judd)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/20 5:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coast Runner, Inc. as to Coast Runner, Inc.. Waiver sent on 12/19/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. (Stone, Judd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 12/19 9:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Indiegogo, Inc., Kickstarter, PBC, Launchboom, Inc. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/18 4:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Coast Runner, Inc.. (Stone, Judd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
2 2 misc Attachment Tue 12/10 11:13 AM
ATTACHMENT Corrected Complaint to1 Complaint by Coast Runner, Inc.. (Stone, Judd)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Tue 12/10 9:44 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Complaint. Incorrect header. Please include Midland/Odessa Division. Please do not refile the entire document as it will create a duplicate charge. Please file ONLY the document. Use the ATTACHMENT event from the menu and attach the proposed document as the Main Document LINK the proposed document to the original. In the docket text, type Corrected Complaint.(je3)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19558320). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Coast Runner, Inc..(Stone, Judd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12/10 9:32 AM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (je3)
Related: [-]