California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:24-cv-08879
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 2:11 AM PST
Defendant
CDK Global, LLC
Represented By
Shawn Lawrence Raymond
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Vineet Bhatia
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Jesse-Justin Cuevas
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Madeline Yzurdiaga
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tekion Corp.
Represented By
Armen Nercess Nercessian
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Erica R. Sutter
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Tyler Griffin Newby
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
39 39 23 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 04/16 6:34 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/16/2025. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 04/16 4:44 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Tekion Corp..(Newby, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Armen Nercessian,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Nercessian Decl
Monday, April 07, 2025
37 37 21 pgs respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 04/07 3:04 PM
REPLY Related [+] DEFENDANT CDK GLOBAL, LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed byCDK Global, LLC.(Bhatia, Vineet)
Related: [-] 23 MOTION to Dismiss
Att: 1 Declaration of Vineet Bhatia in Support of Defendant CDK Global, LLC's Reply,
Att: 2 Exhibit 4,
Att: 3 Exhibit 5
Friday, March 28, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/28 3:29 PM
Set/Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/26/2025 at 10:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor. Joint statement is due by 6/18/2025. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
36 36 32 pgs respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 03/24 9:33 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byTekion Corp.. (Gahtan, Adam)
Related: [-] 23 MOTION to Dismiss
35 35 order Order on Stipulation Mon 03/24 8:58 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 34 Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearings. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/24 9:01 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to23 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing reset for 6/26/2025 at 10:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
34 34 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/21 8:02 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 Order on Stipulation,,, re Extending Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearings filed by Tekion Corp..(Nercessian, Armen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Armen Nercessian
Monday, February 24, 2025
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/24 10:37 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cortnay-Beth Cymrot. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/24 10:34 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Adam Gahtan. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
31 31 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 02/21 1:35 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nercessian, Armen)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/21 12:39 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20375996.) filed by Tekion Corp.. (Cymrot, Cortnay-Beth)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/21 12:22 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20375860.) filed by Tekion Corp.. (Gahtan, Adam)
Related: [-]
28 28 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 02/21 11:10 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by CDK Global, LLC (Bhatia, Vineet)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Tue 02/18 8:35 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE. 25-cv-1394 is related to 24-cv-8879. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/18/2025. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/18 2:58 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to23 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 3/24/2025. Replies due by 4/7/2025. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
26 26 oth_sup Statement of Non-Opposition Fri 02/14 11:47 AM
Statement of Non-Opposition re24 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-12 AND 7-11 filed byTekion Corp.. Related [+] (Newby, Tyler)
Related: [-] 24
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
25 25 3 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 02/11 5:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by CDK Global, LLC identifying Other Affiliate CDK Global Holdings II, LLC, Other Affiliate CDK Global Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Central TopCo Inc., Other Affiliate Brookfield Business Partners, Other Affiliate Brookfield Asset Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Central Parent LLC, Other Affiliate Central HoldCo LLC, Other Affiliate CDK Global II LLC for CDK Global, LLC. re13 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Bhatia, Vineet)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
24 24 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 02/10 8:53 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-12 AND 7-11 filed by CDK Global, LLC. Responses due by 2/14/2025.(Bhatia, Vineet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of V. Bhatia,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
23 23 32 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 02/10 8:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by CDK Global, LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 4/24/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor. Responses due by 2/24/2025. Replies due by 3/3/2025.(Bhatia, Vineet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of V. Bhatia,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 01/15 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Erica R. Sutter on behalf of Tekion Corp. (Sutter, Erica)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 01/15 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Madeline Yzurdiaga on behalf of CDK Global, LLC (Yzurdiaga, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
20 20 order Order on Stipulation Mon 01/06 10:01 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting as modified 14 Stipulation Extending the Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Setting a Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. 1. CDK's deadline to respond to the Complaint is February 10, 2025. 2. The Parties will follow the following briefing schedule: a. CDK will file its motion to dismiss on February 10, 2025; b. Tekion will file its opposition on March 24, 2025; and c. CDK will file its reply on April 7, 2025. d. The hearing on the motion is set for April 24, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor. 3. The Initial Case Management Conference is reset for April 24, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor. Joint statement is due by April 17, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/06 9:21 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shawn Raymond. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/06 9:19 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Vineet Bhatia. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/06 8:11 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 01/06/2025.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Friday, January 03, 2025
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 01/03 4:28 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
15 15 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 01/02 1:16 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CDK Global, LLC.. (Cuevas, Jesse-Justin)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 01/02 1:14 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending the Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Setting a Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by CDK Global, LLC. (Cuevas, Jesse-Justin)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 01/02 1:02 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by CDK Global, LLC identifying Other Affiliate CDK Global Holdings II, LLC, Other Affiliate CDK Global Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate CDK Global, Inc., Other Affiliate Central TopCo Inc., Other Affiliate Brookfield Business Corporation, Other Affiliate Brookfield Business Partners, Other Affiliate Brookfield Asset Management, Inc. for CDK Global, LLC. (Cuevas, Jesse-Justin)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 01/02 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jesse-Justin Cuevas on behalf of CDK Global, LLC (Cuevas, Jesse-Justin)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/02 12:31 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20189842.) filed by CDK Global, LLC. (Raymond, Shawn)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/02 12:27 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20189822.) filed by CDK Global, LLC. (Bhatia, Vineet)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 12/23 2:23 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tekion Corp... (Nercessian, Armen)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 12/16 5:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tekion Corp. of Summons and Complaint on Defendant CDK Global, LLC (Nercessian, Armen)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 12/16 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Armen Nercess Nercessian on behalf of Tekion Corp. (Nercessian, Armen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 12/12 5:10 PM
Summons Issued as to CDK Global, LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 12/12 5:03 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 12/10 9:05 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/24/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 12/09 4:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by TEKION CORP., a Delaware corporation (Newby, Tyler)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 12/09 3:41 PM
Proposed Summons. (Newby, Tyler)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT for Damages and for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against CDK Global, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20124182.). Filed by TEKION CORP., a Delaware corporation.(Newby, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 5 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet