New Jersey District Court
Judge:Katharine S Hayden
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:24-cv-11001
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 5:34 AM EST
Defendant
MIGUEL A. BATISTA DIAZ
Defendant
JOHN CONNORS
Defendant
ARMORTEC PAVING & PATIOS CORP.
Plaintiff
CAMBRIDGE PAVERS INC.
Represented By
LAWRENCE D. MANDEL
Gertner Mandel, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 05/15 9:47 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ARMORTEC PAVING & PATIOS CORP., and MIGUEL A. BATISTA DIAZ for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
14 14 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 05/14 2:00 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by CAMBRIDGE PAVERS INC. against ARMORTEC PAVING & PATIOS CORP., et al..(SUTTON, EZRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certification
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
13 13 misc Substitution of Attorney Wed 05/07 10:18 AM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LAWRENCE D. MANDEL terminated..(SUTTON, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Service on defendant corp.
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 05/06 3:50 PM
TEXT ORDER -- The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Attorney (ECF No.11 ). Attorneys do not require leave of Court to withdraw if other counsel is substituted. See L. Civ. R. 102.1. Plaintiff is directed to submit a formal substitution of attorney.11 Motion to Substitute Attorney is terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 5/6/2025. (JB, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 05/02 2:04 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph Sutton by CAMBRIDGE PAVERS INC.. (SUTTON, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/02 5:11 PM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph Sutton . Motion set for 6/2/2025 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 12:55 PM
LETTER ORDER that counsel are directed to move this civil action, by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to answer out of time, within twenty (20) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on Tuesday, May 20, 2025. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 4/29/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Mon 03/17 2:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint and summons served on Miguel A. Batista Diaz on February 23, 2025, filed by CAMBRIDGE PAVERS INC.. (MANDEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 03/12 4:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Armortec Paving & Patios Corp. on March 3, 2025, filed by CAMBRIDGE PAVERS INC..(MANDEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Attempted Service on Last Known Registered Agent at Registered Office
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
7 7 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Wed 02/19 9:51 AM
AO120 Trademark Form filed. (wh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 See attached Amended Complaint
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/18 1:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ARMORTEC PAVING & PATIOS CORP., MIGUEL A. BATISTA DIAZ, JOHN CONNORS, filed by CAMBRIDGE PAVERS INC..(MANDEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service of Amended Complaint
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 11:46 AM
LETTER ORDER that counsel are directed to move this civil action, by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to answer out of time, within twenty (20) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on Tuesday, March 11, 2025. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 2/18/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
4 4 misc Affidavit Thu 01/30 4:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT Proof of Service by CAMBRIDGE PAVERS INC.. (MANDEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 12/10 5:29 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARMORTEC PAVING & PATIOS CORP., MIGUEL A. BATISTA DIAZ, JOHN CONNORS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Tue 12/10 5:27 PM
AO120 Trademark Form filed. (sm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint and Exhibit
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/10 12:41 PM
Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/09 5:55 PM
COMPLAINT against CAMBRIDGE PAVERS INC., MIGUEL A. BATISTA DIAZ, JOHN CONNORS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15862319) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CAMBRIDGE PAVERS INC..(MANDEL, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]